Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 00:04:04 (UTC).

In the matter of Louis W Sorokowski

Case Summary

On 07/01/2016 In the matter of Louis W Sorokowski was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6763

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wilson, Vivian

Not Classified By Court

Ferguson, Nancy

Interested Party

Lovato, Sandra

Decedent

Sorokowski, Louis W.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Polly Welsh McGilvray

Interested Party Attorney

Richard A Lewis

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/11/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/11/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/11/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/11/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/11/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/11/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Vivian(Petitioner))

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 07/01/2016 .

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 07/01/2016 .

Petition for Letters of Special Administration with General Powers filed.

Petition for Letters of Special Administration with General Powers filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Vivian(Petitioner))

Correspondence filed.

Correspondence filed. (Filed By: McGilvray, Polly(Attorney))

Correspondence filed.

Correspondence filed. (Filed By: McGilvray, Polly(Attorney))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/13/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/13/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Vivian(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/11/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/11/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Request - Other (Request for Dismissal) filed.

Request - Other (Request for Dismissal) filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Vivian(Petitioner))

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Other (Request for Dismissal) filed. (Filed By: Lovato, Sandra(Interested Party))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Other (Request for Dismissal) filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Vivian(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/11/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Matter dropped from calendar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/11/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Matter dropped from calendar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/11/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/11/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/11/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit - Other (result-mediation) filed. (Filed By: McGilvray, Polly(Attorney))

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Objection (Will Contest of Petition for Probate and Authorization to Administer the Estate of Louis Walter Sorokowski and Grounds of Opposition to Probate of the Purported Will) filed. (Filed By: Lovato, Sandra(Interested Party))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Lovato, Sandra added as a Interested Party effective 08/02/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Vivian(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Vivian(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 07/01/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 08/30/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Vivian(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Wilson, Vivian(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Polly Welsh McGilvray