Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 04:28:45 (UTC).

In the matter of Larry Poore

Case Summary

On 08/17/2016 In the matter of Larry Poore was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9338

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

John, Raymond

Fligge, Sterling

Claimant

CAPITAL ONE

Decedent

Poore, Larry

Not Classified By Court

Stover, Richard E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Michael L Hanks

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/02/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/02/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner); John, Raymond(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner); John, Raymond(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner); John, Raymond(Petitioner))

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner); John, Raymond(Petitioner))

Proof of Subscribing Witness filed.

Proof of Subscribing Witness filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner); John, Raymond(Petitioner))

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner))

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action (2)) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action (2)) filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner); John, Raymond(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/02/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/02/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: CAPITAL ONE(Claimant))

Will of Larry W. Poore Admitted into Probate

Will of Larry W. Poore Admitted into Probate

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner))

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner); John, Raymond(Petitioner))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Polycomp(Creditor))

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Polycomp(Creditor))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Polycomp added as a Creditor effective 04/17/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner); John, Raymond(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Will of Larry W. Poore Admitted into Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: CAPITAL ONE(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • CAPITAL ONE added as a Claimant effective 03/20/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/02/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Will admitted to probate on 03/02/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Court appointed Richard E. Stover as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 03/02/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 03/02/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner); John, Raymond(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • A will has been associated to this case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 11/21/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner); John, Raymond(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Fligge, Sterling(Petitioner); John, Raymond(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael L Hanks