This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 01:18:18 (UTC).

In the matter of Katherine Diana Yeoman

Case Summary

On 07/15/2016 In the matter of Katherine Diana Yeoman was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7309

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kendrick, Tamara

Not Classified By Court

Stover, Richard E.

Decedent

Yeoman, Katherine Diana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Amy H Ruggles

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters of Special Administration Without General Powers filed.

Petition for Letters of Special Administration Without General Powers filed. (Filed By: Kendrick, Tamara(Petitioner))

Proof of Holographic Instrument filed.

Proof of Holographic Instrument filed. (Filed By: Kendrick, Tamara(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Kendrick, Tamara(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Kendrick, Tamara(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/13/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/13/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Kendrick, Tamara(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/08/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/08/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/08/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/08/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Order - Other submitted by Ruggles, Amy H rejected on 01/06/2017 .

Order - Other submitted by Ruggles, Amy H rejected on 01/06/2017 . (Filed By: Ruggles, Amy(Attorney))

Order for Probate

Order for Probate

Letters of Special Administration filed.

Letters of Special Administration filed. (Filed By: Kendrick, Tamara(Petitioner))

Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed. (Filed By: Kendrick, Tamara(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Account) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Account) filed. (Filed By: Kendrick, Tamara(Petitioner))

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Waiver of Account) filed. (Filed By: Kendrick, Tamara(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed. (Filed By: Kendrick, Tamara(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters of Special Administration filed. (Filed By: Kendrick, Tamara(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other submitted by Ruggles, Amy H rejected on 01/06/2017 . (Filed By: Ruggles, Amy(Attorney))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/08/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Court appointed Richard E. Stover as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Tamara Kendrick as Special Administrator of the estate of Katherine Diana Yeoman on 12/08/16, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Stover, Richard E. appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Petition for Letters of Special Administration Without General Powers has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate continued to 12/08/2016 at 09:00 in this department.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 12/08/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 12/08/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Kendrick, Tamara(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Kendrick, Tamara(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Holographic Instrument filed. (Filed By: Kendrick, Tamara(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 10/13/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Special Administration Without General Powers filed. (Filed By: Kendrick, Tamara(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less