Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 23:53:11 (UTC).

In the matter of Karen Walsh

Case Summary

On 06/29/2016 In the matter of Karen Walsh was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6663

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cuddy, Linda

Claimant

Cash Call

Not Classified By Court

Ferguson, Nancy

Interested Party

Frontier Communications

Decedent

Walsh, Karen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHERI L. HOFFMAN

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Cuddy, Linda(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Cuddy, Linda(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Cuddy, Linda(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Cuddy, Linda(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Cuddy, Linda(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Order for Probate/Order Appointing Administrator

Order for Probate/Order Appointing Administrator

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Cuddy, Linda(Petitioner))

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Cuddy, Linda(Petitioner))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Cash Call(Claimant))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Frontier Communications(Interested Party))

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Frontier Communications(Interested Party))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Cash Call(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Cash Call added as a Claimant effective 11/18/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Cuddy, Linda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Letter issued .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed. (Filed By: Cuddy, Linda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate/Order Appointing Administrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Court appointed Nancy Ferguson as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Linda Cuddy as Administratrix of the estate of Karen Walsh on 08/30/16, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2016
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Cuddy, Linda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Cuddy, Linda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Cuddy, Linda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 08/30/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Cuddy, Linda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Cuddy, Linda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHERI L. HOFFMAN