Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 02:56:26 (UTC).

In the matter of Joseph G Beckford

Case Summary

On 08/01/2016 In the matter of Joseph G Beckford was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8261

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Beckford, Maryanne

Decedent

Beckford, Joseph G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Michelle A Goff

 

Court Documents

Spousal Property Petition filed.

Spousal Property Petition filed. (Filed By: Beckford, Maryanne(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/11/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/11/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Beckford, Maryanne(Petitioner))

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 09/30/2016 .

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 09/30/2016 .

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Beckford, Maryanne(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/11/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/11/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Beckford, Maryanne(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/11/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/11/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Spousal Property Petition filed.

Spousal Property Petition filed. (Filed By: Beckford, Maryanne(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Beckford, Maryanne(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/10/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/10/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed. (Filed By: Beckford, Maryanne(Petitioner))

Spousal Or Domestic Partner Property Order

Spousal Or Domestic Partner Property Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/10/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/10/2017 09:00:00 AM .

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/10/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Spousal Property Petition filed by Maryanne Beckford is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Spousal Property Petition has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Spousal Or Domestic Partner Property Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name filed. (Filed By: Beckford, Maryanne(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/10/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Beckford, Maryanne(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 01/10/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Spousal Property Petition filed. (Filed By: Beckford, Maryanne(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/11/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Beckford, Maryanne(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/11/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Beckford, Maryanne(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 09/30/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Beckford, Maryanne(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/11/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 10/11/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Spousal Property Petition filed. (Filed By: Beckford, Maryanne(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less