This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/11/2017 at 06:56:45 (UTC).

In the matter of Jones

Case Summary

On 10/20/2014 In the matter of Jones was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0308

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Department of Developmental Services

Conservatee

Jones, Justin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Adam Lewis

 

Court Documents

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/09/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/09/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/09/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/09/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/30/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/30/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/30/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/30/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/04/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/04/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/04/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/04/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/04/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/04/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/17/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/17/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/17/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/17/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/17/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/17/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketOrder After Conservatorship Review Investigation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/09/2015 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketOrder on Petition for Attorney Fees for Court Appointed Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/09/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice of Conservatee's Rights) filed. (Filed By: Department of Developmental Services(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Jones, Justin(Conservatee))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/30/2015 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Probate continued to 07/09/2015 at 09:00 in this department.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 07/09/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 07/09/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2014
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 02/04/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/17/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • DocketCitation - Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Department of Developmental Services(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Department of Developmental Services(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • DocketLewis, Adam added as a effective 11/13/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/17/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • DocketReciprocal Request Letter sent to County of Merced

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 12/17/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Gary, Matthew .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator - Limited Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Department of Developmental Services(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF DEVELOPMENTAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAM LEWIS