This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 11:51:38 (UTC).

In the matter of Johnny Ray Ward

Case Summary

On 10/06/2016 In the matter of Johnny Ray Ward was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1385

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ward, Raymond Keoni

Claimant

INHERITANCE FUNDING COMPANY

Decedent

Ward, Johnny Ray

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Angela C Thompson

Claimant Attorney

Steven D Schroeder

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/07/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/07/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/04/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/04/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/08/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/08/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

Request - Special Notice filed.

Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: INHERITANCE FUNDING COMPANY(Claimant))

Affidavit - Other filed.

Affidavit - Other filed. (Filed By: INHERITANCE FUNDING COMPANY(Claimant))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/07/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/07/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Affidavit - Other (waiver of bond) filed.

Affidavit - Other (waiver of bond) filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/04/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/04/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Declaration - Other (Johnny Elika Ward's Assignment #1, Sale and Transfer of Beneficial Interest in Decedent'd Estate to Inheritance Funding Company, Inc.) filed.

Declaration - Other (Johnny Elika Ward's Assignment #1, Sale and Transfer of Beneficial Interest in Decedent'd Estate to Inheritance Funding Company, Inc.) filed. (Filed By: INHERITANCE FUNDING COMPANY(Claimant))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

Notice - Other filed.

Notice - Other filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

Notice of Death filed.

Notice of Death filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

Will of Johnny Ray Ward Admitted into Probate

Will of Johnny Ray Ward Admitted into Probate

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Will of Johnny Ray Ward Admitted into Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/08/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Will admitted to probate on 03/08/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Court appointed James R Tucker as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Raymond Keoni Ward as Executor of the estate of Johnny Ward on 03/08/2017, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Tucker, James R appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Death filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: INHERITANCE FUNDING COMPANY(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Schroeder, Steven D added as a effective 10/19/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • INHERITANCE FUNDING COMPANY added as a Claimant effective 10/19/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 10/06/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 12/07/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Ward, Raymond(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less