Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 03:45:04 (UTC).

In the matter of Jody Lynne Richardson

Case Summary

On 08/10/2016 In the matter of Jody Lynne Richardson was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8665

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Stetson, Edward

Claimants

Stetson, Gene

State of California Franchise Tax Board

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Decedent

Richardson, Jody Lynne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Edvard Nazaryan

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Nomination of Personal Representative and Waiver of Notice) filed.

Declaration - Other (Nomination of Personal Representative and Waiver of Notice) filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Supplemental - Other filed.

Supplemental - Other filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

Order Appointing Administrator

Order Appointing Administrator

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

Surety Bond filed.

Surety Bond filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

Order - Other submitted by Nazaryan, Edvard rejected on 11/16/2016 .

Order - Other submitted by Nazaryan, Edvard rejected on 11/16/2016 . (Filed By: Nazaryan, Edvard(Attorney))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Gene(Claimant))

Request - Special Notice filed.

Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: State of California Franchise Tax Board(Claimant))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: State of California Franchise Tax Board(Claimant))

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: State of California Franchise Tax Board(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: State of California Franchise Tax Board(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • State of California Franchise Tax Board added as a Claimant effective 05/08/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Gene(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Stetson, Gene added as a Claimant effective 01/20/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other submitted by Nazaryan, Edvard rejected on 11/16/2016 . (Filed By: Nazaryan, Edvard(Attorney))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Surety Bond filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Additional bond ordered.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Nazaryan, Edvard added as a effective 10/14/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Nomination of Personal Representative and Waiver of Notice) filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 10/26/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Stetson, Edward(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nazaryan, Edvard