Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 23:58:45 (UTC).

In the matter of Joan Low Choy

Case Summary

On 06/30/2016 In the matter of Joan Low Choy was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6723

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Choy, Eddie S.

Decedent

Choy, Joan Low

Not Classified By Court

Ferguson, Nancy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Borden D Webb

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/21/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/21/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/21/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/21/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

Order for Probate/Order Appointing Executor

Order for Probate/Order Appointing Executor

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Notice - Other filed.

Notice - Other filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

Notice - Other (Notice of Filing Inventory and Appraisal, Final) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice of Filing Inventory and Appraisal, Final) filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

Will of Joan Low Choy Admitted into Probate

Will of Joan Low Choy Admitted into Probate

Notice - Other (Amended Notice Of Filing Inventory And Appaisal, Final) filed.

Notice - Other (Amended Notice Of Filing Inventory And Appaisal, Final) filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Accounting) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Accounting) filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed.

Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

Order Approving First And Final Report Of Executive On Waiver Of Account; Allowing, etc.

Order Approving First And Final Report Of Executive On Waiver Of Account; Allowing, etc.

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/21/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/21/2017 09:00:00 AM .

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/21/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed by Eddie Choy is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Approving First And Final Report Of Executive On Waiver Of Account; Allowing, etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/21/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/21/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 03/21/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Waiver of Accounting) filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate/Order Appointing Executor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 08/30/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declination to Act as Co-Executor Norman S Choy) filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Choy, Eddie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Borden D Webb