Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 22:13:30 (UTC).

In the matter of Janet Frank

Case Summary

On 06/10/2016 In the matter of Janet Frank was filed as a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5752

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Young, Carolyn M.

Claimants

Bean, Susan

Thomsen, Steven

Not Classified By Court

Frank, Paul D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gina L Lera

Claimant Attorney

Daniel I Spector

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Jerilyn Paik

 

Court Documents

Petition Concerning the Internal Affairs of a Trust or to Determine the Existence of a Trust (Prob Code 17200) (Case Initiation) filed.

Petition Concerning the Internal Affairs of a Trust or to Determine the Existence of a Trust (Prob Code 17200) (Case Initiation) filed. (Filed By: Young, Carolyn(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/16/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/16/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Young, Carolyn(Petitioner))

Statement - Other filed.

Statement - Other filed. (Filed By: Bean, Susan(Claimant); Thomsen, Steven(Claimant))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/16/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/16/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/16/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/16/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/25/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/25/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Young, Carolyn(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver Of Personal Service On Behalf Of Paul D. Frank By Stephanie R. Poston, Esq.) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver Of Personal Service On Behalf Of Paul D. Frank By Stephanie R. Poston, Esq.) filed. (Filed By: Young, Carolyn(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/25/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/25/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Declaration in Response to Probate Notes

Declaration in Response to Probate Notes

Objection filed.

Objection filed. (Filed By: Frank, Paul(Objector))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/25/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/25/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/14/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/14/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/14/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/14/2017 09:00:00 AM .

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/14/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Petition Concerning the Internal Affairs of a Trust or to Determine the Existence of a Trust (Prob Code 17200) (Case Initiation) filed by Carolyn Young is dismissed by the Court with prejudice per Petitioner's request.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Petition Concerning the Internal Affairs of a Trust or to Determine the Existence of a Trust (Prob Code 17200) (Case Initiation) has been Denied .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/14/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/25/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate continued to 03/14/2017 at 09:00 in this department.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 03/14/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 03/14/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Objection filed. (Filed By: Frank, Paul(Objector))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Paik, Jerilyn added as a effective 10/24/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/16/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement - Other filed. (Filed By: Bean, Susan(Claimant); Thomsen, Steven(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Spector, Daniel I added as a effective 07/21/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Thomsen, Steven added as a Claimant effective 07/21/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Bean, Susan added as a Claimant effective 07/21/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Young, Carolyn(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/16/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 08/16/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition Concerning the Internal Affairs of a Trust or to Determine the Existence of a Trust (Prob Code 17200) (Case Initiation) filed. (Filed By: Young, Carolyn(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gina L Lera