This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/10/2017 at 19:22:48 (UTC).

In the matter of James Andrew Strauch

Case Summary

On 06/12/2014 In the matter of James Andrew Strauch was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4748

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Claycomb, Robert D.

Latimer, Doreen Renee

Claimant

FIA Card Services

Not Classified By Court

Stover, Richard E.

Decedent

Strauch, James Andrew

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lynn A Dean

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/24/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/24/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/16/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/16/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/23/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/23/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/22/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/22/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Letters (Letters of Administration) filed.

Letters (Letters of Administration) filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

Surety Bond filed.

Surety Bond filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/24/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/24/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Claycomb, Robert(Petitioner); Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Claycomb, Robert(Petitioner); Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/22/2015 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketMatter dropped from calendar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/22/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/23/2015 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketThe Petition for Hearing - Probate is scheduled for 10/22/2015 at 09:00 AM in Department 129.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 10/22/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/23/2015 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketThe final accounting is approved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketAccount and report approved.

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters (Letters of Administration) filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • DocketLetters (Letters of Administration) filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder For Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/24/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 07/24/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Gary, Matthew .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Latimer, Doreen(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fia Card Services, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynn A Dean