This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/05/2017 at 16:23:17 (UTC).

In the matter of Helen Victoria Born

Case Summary

On 04/11/2017 In the matter of Helen Victoria Born was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0916

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Glass, Melinda

Decedent

Born, Helen Victoria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Deborah Meyer Morris

 

Court Documents

Order - Other submitted by Morris, Deborah Meyer rejected on 05/02/2017 .

Order - Other submitted by Morris, Deborah Meyer rejected on 05/02/2017 . (Filed By: Morris, Deborah(Attorney))

Order - Other (Stipulation For Continuance And Order) submitted by The Superior Court of Sacramento rejected on 05/02/2017 .

Order - Other (Stipulation For Continuance And Order) submitted by The Superior Court of Sacramento rejected on 05/02/2017 .

Notice - Other filed.

Notice - Other filed. (Filed By: Glass, Melinda(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Glass, Melinda(Petitioner))

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Glass, Melinda(Petitioner))

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other submitted by Morris, Deborah Meyer rejected on 05/02/2017 . (Filed By: Morris, Deborah(Attorney))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Stipulation For Continuance And Order) submitted by The Superior Court of Sacramento rejected on 05/02/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other filed. (Filed By: Glass, Melinda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other filed. (Filed By: Glass, Melinda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Morris, Deborah Meyer added as a effective 04/28/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Case assigned to Department 129 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Glass, Melinda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Glass, Melinda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEYER-MORRIS DEBORAH