Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 03:07:05 (UTC).

In the matter of Gerald K Olson

Case Summary

On 08/03/2016 In the matter of Gerald K Olson was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8244

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sanders-Olson, Rosalie

Interested Party

Approved Inheritance Cash, Inc.

Decedent

Olson, Gerald K.

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Paul R Kraft

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/28/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/28/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/14/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/14/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/14/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/14/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/15/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/15/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/15/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/15/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Sanders-Olson, Rosalie(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Sanders-Olson, Rosalie(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/28/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/28/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Amended Petition filed.

Amended Petition filed. (Filed By: Sanders-Olson, Rosalie(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Sanders-Olson, Rosalie(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/14/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/14/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/14/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/14/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Affidavit - Other (assignment of interest) filed.

Affidavit - Other (assignment of interest) filed. (Filed By: Approved Inheritance Cash, Inc.(Interested Party))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Sanders-Olson, Rosalie(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficary) filed. (Filed By: Sanders-Olson, Rosalie(Petitioner))

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/15/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/15/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Sanders-Olson, Rosalie(Petitioner))

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed. (Filed By: Sanders-Olson, Rosalie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/15/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Court appointed James R Tucker as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Rosalie Sanders-Olson as Administrator of the estate of Gerald Olson on 02/15/2017, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Tucker, James R appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Amended Petition has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order For Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficary) filed. (Filed By: Sanders-Olson, Rosalie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/15/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Sanders-Olson, Rosalie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Petition filed. (Filed By: Sanders-Olson, Rosalie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/28/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate continued to 12/14/2016 at 09:00 in this department.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 12/14/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 12/14/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/28/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 09/28/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Sanders-Olson, Rosalie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Sanders-Olson, Rosalie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Approved Inheritance Cash, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kraft, Paul R.