Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 14:33:35 (UTC).

In the matter of Frederick C Plaskett

Case Summary

On 03/16/2016 In the matter of Frederick C Plaskett was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2037

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Urban, Tanci

Not Classified By Court

Notestein, Jerry

Decedent

Plaskett, Frederick C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Guy R Gibson

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/02/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/02/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

Order for Probate/Order Appointing Administrator

Order for Probate/Order Appointing Administrator

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 06/02/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 06/02/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed.

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed.

Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

Affidavit - Other (2 waiver of acctg) filed.

Affidavit - Other (2 waiver of acctg) filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

Affidavit - Other (waiver of commission) filed.

Affidavit - Other (waiver of commission) filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

Order Approving And Settling The First Report On Waiver Of Account By Administrator, etc.

Order Approving And Settling The First Report On Waiver Of Account By Administrator, etc.

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM .

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed by Tanci Urban is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Approving And Settling The First Report On Waiver Of Account By Administrator, etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit - Other (waiver of commission) filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit - Other (2 waiver of acctg) filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 02/16/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate/Order Appointing Administrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/02/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 06/02/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Urban, Tanci(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less