Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 03:33:48 (UTC).

In the matter of Florence Kunitake

Case Summary

On 08/08/2016 In the matter of Florence Kunitake was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8709

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nishi, Darrell

Not Classified By Court

Stover, Richard E.

Decedent

Kunitake, Florence

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Marissa D Sirota

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Nishi, Darrell(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Nishi, Darrell(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Nishi, Darrell(Petitioner))

Correspondence filed.

Correspondence filed. (Filed By: Sirota, Marissa(Attorney))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/10/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/10/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Nishi, Darrell(Petitioner))

Amended Petition (Amended Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters of Administration w/Will Annexed) filed.

Amended Petition (Amended Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters of Administration w/Will Annexed) filed. (Filed By: Nishi, Darrell(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Nishi, Darrell(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Nishi, Darrell(Petitioner))

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Nishi, Darrell(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Will of Florence S. Kunitake Admitted into Probate

Will of Florence S. Kunitake Admitted into Probate

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Nishi, Darrell(Petitioner))

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Nishi, Darrell(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Will of Florence S. Kunitake Admitted into Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Will admitted to probate on 02/16/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Court appointed Richard E. Stover as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Darrell Nishi as Administrator of the estate of Florence Kunitake on 02/16/2017, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Stover, Richard E. appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Amended Petition has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/16/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Darrell Nishi is dropped by the Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate continued to 02/16/2017 at 09:00 in this department.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 02/16/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 02/16/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Correspondence filed. (Filed By: Sirota, Marissa(Attorney))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Nishi, Darrell(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 11/10/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Nishi, Darrell(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Nishi, Darrell(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less