Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 22:02:19 (UTC).

In the matter of Evan Richmond

Case Summary

On 06/08/2016 In the matter of Evan Richmond was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5613

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Richmond, Kenton

Richmond, Joann

Conservatee

Richmond, Evan

Not Classified By Court

Ferguson, Nancy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Daphne Xiao

Conservatee Attorney

Peter P Vlautin

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/08/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/08/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/08/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/08/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/08/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/08/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/21/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/21/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/07/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/07/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/07/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/07/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/21/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/21/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/07/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/07/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/30/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/30/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/30/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Notice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Richmond, Evan(Conservatee))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/07/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Counsel for Evan Richmond released.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Court appointed Nancy Ferguson as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • The Court orders assessment fee waived.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Kenton Richmond and Joann Richmond as Limited Co-Conservators of the person and estate of Evan Richmond on 03/07/2017, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Ferguson, Nancy appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Amended Petition has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 05/30/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2016
  • Verification that Video Tape of Conservator Duties Has Been Viewed filed. (Filed By: Richmond, Joann(Petitioner); Richmond, Kenton(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Citation - Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Richmond, Joann(Petitioner); Richmond, Kenton(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Notice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Richmond, Joann(Petitioner); Richmond, Kenton(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Citation - Conservatorship submitted by Richmond, Kenton rejected on 07/25/2016 . (Filed By: Richmond, Kenton(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 08/30/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 08/23/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Notification to Court of Address on Conservatorship/Guardianship filed. (Filed By: Richmond, Joann(Petitioner); Richmond, Kenton(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed. (Filed By: Richmond, Joann(Petitioner); Richmond, Kenton(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter P Vlautin