Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 03:45:08 (UTC).

In the matter of Emma Sophia Rydzynski

Case Summary

On 08/10/2016 In the matter of Emma Sophia Rydzynski was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8674

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rydzynski, Paul

Decedent

Rydzynski, Emma Sophia

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dustin Macfarlane

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

Affidavit - Other (waiver of bond) filed.

Affidavit - Other (waiver of bond) filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Order Appointing Administrator

Order Appointing Administrator

Letters (Letters of Administration) filed.

Letters (Letters of Administration) filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Account by Distributee) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Account by Distributee) filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

Affidavit - Other (waiver of acct) filed.

Affidavit - Other (waiver of acct) filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit - Other (waiver of acct) filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Waiver of Account by Distributee) filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Court appointed James R Tucker as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Paul Rydzynski as Administrator of the Estate of Emma Rydzynski on 10/26/16, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Tucker, James R appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters (Letters of Administration) filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Appointing Administrator

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit - Other (waiver of bond) filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Macfarlane, Dustin added as a effective 08/18/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 10/26/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Rydzynski, Paul(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dustin Macfarlane