Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 05:35:43 (UTC).

In the Matter of Elizabeth Berger

Case Summary

On 01/15/2016 In the Matter of Elizabeth Berger was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9151

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Blythe, Andrew

Not Classified By Court

Carrad, Emmanuelle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Julie R. Woods

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Rebecca A Gardner

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/08/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/08/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/04/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/04/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition - Other (Case Initiation) ((1) Determine Validity Of Disclaimer Of INdividual Retirement Account; (2) Confirm Beneficiary Of Individual Retirement Account; And (3) Instruct The Custodian Of The Individual Retirement Account) filed.

Petition - Other (Case Initiation) ((1) Determine Validity Of Disclaimer Of INdividual Retirement Account; (2) Confirm Beneficiary Of Individual Retirement Account; And (3) Instruct The Custodian Of The Individual Retirement Account) filed. (Filed By: Blythe, Andrew(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Blythe, Andrew(Petitioner))

Supplemental - Other filed.

Supplemental - Other filed. (Filed By: Blythe, Andrew(Petitioner))

Objection (Objection to Petition to (1) Determine Validity of Disclaimer of Retirement Account; (2) Confirm Beneficiary of the Individual Retirement Account; (3) Instruct the Custodian of the Individual Retirement Account) filed.

Objection (Objection to Petition to (1) Determine Validity of Disclaimer of Retirement Account; (2) Confirm Beneficiary of the Individual Retirement Account; (3) Instruct the Custodian of the Individual Retirement Account) filed. (Filed By: Carrad, Emmanuelle(Objector))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Carrad, Emmanuelle(Objector))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/08/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/08/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Carrad, Emmanuelle(Objector))

ADR - Certification and Selection Form filed.

ADR - Certification and Selection Form filed. (Filed By: Carrad, Emmanuelle(Objector))

Supplemental - Other filed.

Supplemental - Other filed. (Filed By: Carrad, Emmanuelle(Objector))

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Blythe, Andrew(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Stipulation And Order Re Stipulation Entered Into Re Enforcement Of Settlement, etc.

Stipulation And Order Re Stipulation Entered Into Re Enforcement Of Settlement, etc.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/04/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation And Order Re Stipulation Entered Into Re Enforcement Of Settlement, etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other filed. (Filed By: Blythe, Andrew(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/04/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate continued to 10/04/2016 at 09:00 in this department.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 10/04/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 10/04/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 05/17/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Carrad, Emmanuelle(Objector))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Objection (Objection to Petition to (1) Determine Validity of Disclaimer of Retirement Account; (2) Confirm Beneficiary of the Individual Retirement Account; (3) Instruct the Custodian of the Individual Retirement Account) filed. (Filed By: Carrad, Emmanuelle(Objector))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Carrad, Emmanuelle added as a Objector effective 03/07/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/08/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplemental - Other filed. (Filed By: Blythe, Andrew(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Blythe, Andrew(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 03/08/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - Other (Case Initiation) ((1) Determine Validity Of Disclaimer Of INdividual Retirement Account; (2) Confirm Beneficiary Of Individual Retirement Account; And (3) Instruct The Custodian Of The Individual Retirement Account) filed. (Filed By: Blythe, Andrew(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOODS JULIE REBECCA