This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/12/2017 at 19:49:43 (UTC).

In the matter of Eleanor M Buehler

Case Summary

On 09/29/2015 In the matter of Eleanor M Buehler was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4816

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Buehler, David M.

Decedent

Buehler, Eleanor M.

Not Classified By Court

Stover, Richard E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Thomas A Craven

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/18/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/18/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/18/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/18/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/28/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/28/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

Order for Probate/Order Appointing Executor

Order for Probate/Order Appointing Executor

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/18/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/18/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Will of Eleanor Masson Buehler admitted into Probate

Will of Eleanor Masson Buehler admitted into Probate

Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed.

Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

Notice - Other (Notice To Franchise Tax Board) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice To Franchise Tax Board) filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

Notice - Other (Notice To Department Of Health Care Services) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice To Department Of Health Care Services) filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

Order Settling First And Final Account And Report Of Executor, Authorizing Statutory, etc.

Order Settling First And Final Account And Report Of Executor, Authorizing Statutory, etc.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Distribution filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/28/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • The First and Final accounting is approved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Account and report approved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed by David Buehler is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Settling First And Final Account And Report Of Executor, Authorizing Statutory, etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/28/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 09/28/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate/Order Appointing Executor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/18/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/18/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 11/18/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer De Alba, David .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Buehler, David(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less