Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 06:32:58 (UTC).

In the matter of Donald Garrison Schweitzer

Case Summary

On 01/26/2016 In the matter of Donald Garrison Schweitzer was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9532

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

McGrath, Rick

McGrath, Delia

Respondent

Schweitzer, Donald P.

Conservatee

Schweitzer, Donald Garrison

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jennifer Campbell

Conservatee Attorney

Ditta Reed

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/15/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/15/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/15/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/15/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/15/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/15/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/03/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/03/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/03/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/03/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/03/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/03/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/28/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/28/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 06/28/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 06/28/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/30/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/30/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2017
  • Notice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Schweitzer, Donald(Conservatee))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/30/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Notice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Schweitzer, Donald(Conservatee))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 05/30/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Court Appointed Counsel Compensation of Fees - Petition filed. (Filed By: Schweitzer, Donald(Conservatee))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 06/28/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Matter dropped from calendar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/28/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Notice of Conservatee's Rights (GC-341) filed. (Filed By: McGrath, Delia(Petitioner); McGrath, Rick(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/03/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2016
  • Schweitzer, Donald P. added as a Respondent effective 03/01/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Objection submitted by Schweitzer, Donald Garrison rejected on 02/18/2016 . (Filed By: Schweitzer, Donald(Conservatee))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/15/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Notice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: McGrath, Delia(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Notification to Court of Address on Conservatorship/Guardianship filed. (Filed By: McGrath, Delia(Petitioner); McGrath, Rick(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 03/15/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Verification that Video Tape of Conservator Duties Has Been Viewed filed. (Filed By: McGrath, Delia(Petitioner); McGrath, Rick(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed. (Filed By: McGrath, Delia(Petitioner); McGrath, Rick(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed. (Filed By: McGrath, Delia(Petitioner); McGrath, Rick(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less