This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/08/2018 at 12:54:08 (UTC).

In the matter of Donald B Davies

Case Summary

On 08/24/2017 In the matter of Donald B Davies was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7915

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Davies, Rosalinda I.

Conservatee

Davies, Donald B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Heather S Mayer

Conservatee Attorney

Julie E. Hitt

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/28/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/28/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/28/2018 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/28/2018 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/03/2018 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/03/2018 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/25/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/25/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/25/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/25/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/25/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/25/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/03/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/03/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/28/2018 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Order To Pay Attorney Fees to Attorney For Donald B. Davies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/28/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Notice of Incorrect Filing Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Notice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Davies, Donald(Conservatee))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 03/28/2018 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Court Appointed Counsel Compensation of Fees - Petition filed. (Filed By: Davies, Donald(Conservatee))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/03/2018 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Counsel for Donald Davies released.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Petition for Appointment of Conservator filed by Rosalinda Davies is dismissed by the Court, without prejudice, as requested by Petitioner.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/25/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Notice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Davies, Rosalinda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Citation - Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Davies, Rosalinda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/25/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 10/25/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Case assigned to Department 129 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Notification to Court of Address on Conservatorship/Guardianship filed. (Filed By: Davies, Rosalinda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Verification that Video Tape of Conservator Duties Has Been Viewed filed. (Filed By: Davies, Rosalinda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed. (Filed By: Davies, Rosalinda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Petition for Appointment of Conservator filed. (Filed By: Davies, Rosalinda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less