This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/10/2017 at 18:13:07 (UTC).

In the matter of Dolores Irene Bruce

Case Summary

On 05/30/2014 In the matter of Dolores Irene Bruce was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4137

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Erstad, Margaret Lorren

Claimants

Ascension Point Recovery Services

Phillips & Cohen Associates, LTD

First Responder

Decedent

Bruce, Dolores Irene

Not Classified By Court

Stover, Richard E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jackie Marie Howard

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/03/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/03/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/03/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/03/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/14/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/14/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Jackie Marie Howard, Attorney For Petitioner Regarding Service of Petition For Probate on Trust Beneficiaries) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Jackie Marie Howard, Attorney For Petitioner Regarding Service of Petition For Probate on Trust Beneficiaries) filed. (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 05/30/2014 .

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 05/30/2014 .

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 05/30/2014 .

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 05/30/2014 .

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/03/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/03/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Surety Bond filed.

Surety Bond filed. (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

Letters (Letters Testamentary) filed.

Letters (Letters Testamentary) filed. (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Phillips & Cohen Associates, LTD(Claimant))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: First Responder(Claimant))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Ascension Point Recovery Services(Claimant))

Ex Parte Application - Other submitted by Erstad, Margaret Lorren rejected on 10/27/2014 .

Ex Parte Application - Other submitted by Erstad, Margaret Lorren rejected on 10/27/2014 . (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Will of Dee Bruce Admitted into Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/14/2015 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed by Margaret Lorren Erstad is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment on Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Accounting and Petition for Allowance of Statutory Commissions to Executor's Attorney and for Reimbursement to Executor and Executor's Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/14/2015 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 05/14/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/03/2014 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 05/30/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 05/30/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration of Jackie Marie Howard, Attorney For Petitioner Regarding Service of Petition For Probate on Trust Beneficiaries) filed. (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 07/03/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gary, Matthew .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Erstad, Margaret(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASCENSION POINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jackie Marie Howard