Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 18:44:28 (UTC).

In the matter of Deborah Montague

Case Summary

On 05/02/2016 In the matter of Deborah Montague was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4429

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Montague, Kevin

Decedent

Montague, Deborah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Alex Beyer

 

Court Documents

Spousal Property Petition filed.

Spousal Property Petition filed. (Filed By: Montague, Kevin(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/04/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/04/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/04/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/04/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/06/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/06/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Affidavit - Other (6 waiver of interest filed) filed.

Affidavit - Other (6 waiver of interest filed) filed. (Filed By: Montague, Kevin(Petitioner))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Montague, Kevin(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Montague, Kevin(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/05/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/05/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Montague, Kevin(Petitioner))

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Montague, Kevin(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/05/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/05/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Affidavit - Other (waiver) filed.

Affidavit - Other (waiver) filed. (Filed By: Montague, Kevin(Petitioner))

Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Order - Spousal

Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Order - Spousal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Order - Spousal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit - Other (waiver) filed. (Filed By: Montague, Kevin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/05/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Spousal Property Petition filed by Kevin Montague is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Spousal Property Petition has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Montague, Kevin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Montague, Kevin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/05/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Montague, Kevin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Montague, Kevin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 01/05/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/04/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate continued to 10/06/2016 at 09:00 in this department.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 10/06/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 10/06/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/04/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 08/04/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Spousal Property Petition filed. (Filed By: Montague, Kevin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less