This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 15:18:43 (UTC).

In the matter of Deborah Chambers

Case Summary

On 11/14/2016 In the matter of Deborah Chambers was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3266

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Moore, James A.

Conservatee

Chambers, Deborah

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Frederick C Heise

Conservatee Attorney

Barbara J Bender

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/07/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/07/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/07/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/07/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/07/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/07/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/25/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/25/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/25/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/25/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/25/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/25/2017 09:00:00 AM .

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2017
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/25/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Counsel for Deborah Chambers released.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Court appointed James R Tucker as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Additional bond ordered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • The Court orders assessment fee waived.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints James Moore as Conservator of the person and estate of Deborah Chambers on 01/25/2017, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Tucker, James R appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Petition for Appointment of Conservator has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2016
  • Statement - Other (Professional Fiduciary's First Statement Regarding Compensation) filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Affidavit - Other (Petitioner's Disclosure re: Payment of Fees and Costs by Mercy San Juan Hospital) filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Statement - Other (Statement Pursuant to Probate Code Section 2250 (c)) filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 12/07/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian or Conservator filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 01/25/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 129 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Verification that Video Tape of Conservator Duties Has Been Viewed filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.