Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 23:58:55 (UTC).

In the matter of Dawn Herndon

Case Summary

On 06/30/2016 In the matter of Dawn Herndon was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6731

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Taylor, Kelsey Elwell

Claimant

Official Pest Prevention INC

Not Classified By Court

Ferguson, Nancy

Decedent

Herndon, Dawn

Interested Parties

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Sterling Jeweler Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Myles Taylor

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed.

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

Affidavit - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary) filed.

Affidavit - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(Interested Party))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Sterling Jeweler Inc.(Interested Party))

Request - Special Notice filed.

Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: Sterling Jeweler Inc.(Interested Party))

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed.

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: Sterling Jeweler Inc.(Interested Party))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Sterling Jeweler Inc.(Interested Party))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Sterling Jeweler Inc. added as a Interested Party effective 02/08/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Official Pest Prevention INC(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Official Pest Prevention INC added as a Claimant effective 01/03/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/30/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 08/30/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Taylor, Kelsey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STERLING JEWELERS INC DBA JARED THE GALLERIA OF JEWELRY is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant