This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/20/2018 at 12:32:24 (UTC).

In the matter of Daniel M Garcia

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 In the matter of Daniel M Garcia was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9861

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Garcia, Rita Cecilia

Claimant

DCM Services

Decedent

Garcia, Daniel M.

Not Classified By Court

Ferguson, Nancy E.

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/24/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/24/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/02/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/02/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/19/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/19/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/02/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/02/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed.

Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/19/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/19/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

Petition for Letters of Administration filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

Amended Petition filed.

Amended Petition filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

Affidavit - Other filed.

Affidavit - Other filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (waiver of bond) filed.

Declaration - Other (waiver of bond) filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: DCM Services(Claimant))

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/24/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 07/24/2018 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/19/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Matter dropped from calendar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/02/2018 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Petition for Letters of Administration filed by Rita C. Garcia is dismissed by the Court, being superseded by the Amended Petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Court appointed Nancy E. Ferguson as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Rita C. Garcia as Administrator of the estate of Daniel M. Garcia on 01/02/2018, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (waiver of bond) filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit - Other filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 01/02/2018 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Petition filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 12/19/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Case assigned to Department 129 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration filed. (Filed By: Garcia, Rita(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less