This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/12/2017 at 22:51:13 (UTC).

In the Matter of Charles Gulebian

Case Summary

On 11/02/2015 In the Matter of Charles Gulebian was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6189

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gulebian, Janet

Guardian Ad Litem

Tran, Andy Phong

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dustin Macfarlane

 

Court Documents

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/19/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/19/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/19/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/19/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Notice of Death filed.

Notice of Death filed. (Filed By: Gulebian, Janet(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing filed.

Notice of Hearing filed. (Filed By: Gulebian, Janet(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition on Current Account with Additional Prayers filed.

Petition on Current Account with Additional Prayers filed. (Filed By: Gulebian, Janet(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/18/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/18/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/18/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/18/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/14/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/14/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/14/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/14/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Motion for Continuance - Other filed.

Motion for Continuance - Other filed. (Filed By: Gulebian, Janet(Petitioner))

Citation - Probate filed.

Citation - Probate filed. (Filed By: Gulebian, Janet(Petitioner))

Petition - Other (Case Initiation) (Petn for order authorizing transaction transferring asset to petnr) filed.

Petition - Other (Case Initiation) (Petn for order authorizing transaction transferring asset to petnr) filed. (Filed By: Gulebian, Janet(Petitioner))

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/19/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Matter dropped from calendar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/19/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Death filed. (Filed By: Gulebian, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing filed. (Filed By: Gulebian, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Matter dropped from calendar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 05/19/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition on Current Account with Additional Prayers filed. (Filed By: Gulebian, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate continued to 03/17/2016 at 09:00 in this department.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 03/17/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 03/17/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/14/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 02/18/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Continuance - Other filed. (Filed By: Gulebian, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Citation - Probate filed. (Filed By: Gulebian, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 01/14/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer De Alba, David .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - Other (Case Initiation) (Petn for order authorizing transaction transferring asset to petnr) filed. (Filed By: Gulebian, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dustin Macfarlane