Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 01:44:17 (UTC).

In the matter of Cecilia Regina Craig

Case Summary

On 07/20/2016 In the matter of Cecilia Regina Craig was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7575

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hernandez-Craig, Anna M.

Decedent

Craig, Cecilia Regina

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Interested Party

Department of Health Care Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rebecca A Gardner

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Rebecca A Gardner) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Rebecca A Gardner) filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Department of Health Care Services(Interested Party))

Request - Special Notice filed.

Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: Department of Health Care Services(Interested Party))

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

Request - Special Notice filed.

Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: Department of Health Care Services(Interested Party))

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: Department of Health Care Services(Interested Party))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: Department of Health Care Services(Interested Party))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Department of Health Care Services(Interested Party))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Department of Health Care Services added as a Interested Party effective 03/10/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Letter issued .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Court appointed James R Tucker as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration of Rebecca A Gardner) filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 09/21/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Hernandez-Craig, Anna(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca A Gardner