Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 08:28:39 (UTC).

In the matter of Antonia Alejandra Martinez

Case Summary

On 02/16/2016 In the matter of Antonia Alejandra Martinez was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0530

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Payton, Brett

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Decedent

Martinez, Antonia Alejandra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Paul R Kraft

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Payton, Brett(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Payton, Brett(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/05/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/05/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Payton, Brett(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Payton, Brett(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/05/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/05/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/05/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/05/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/31/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/31/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/31/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/31/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Order for Probate Appointing Administrator

Order for Probate Appointing Administrator

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/31/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/31/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Surety Bond filed.

Surety Bond filed. (Filed By: Payton, Brett(Petitioner))

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Payton, Brett(Petitioner))

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Payton, Brett(Petitioner))

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Payton, Brett(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Letter issued .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed. (Filed By: Payton, Brett(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Surety Bond filed. (Filed By: Payton, Brett(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/31/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Court appointed James R Tucker as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Additional bond ordered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Brett Payton as Administrator of the estate of Antonia Alejandra Martinez on 05/31/16, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Tucker, James R appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 05/31/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 05/31/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/05/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Payton, Brett(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Payton, Brett(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/05/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 04/05/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Payton, Brett(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Payton, Brett(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kraft, Paul R.