Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 11:41:16 (UTC).

In the matter of Annie Marie Willis

Case Summary

On 02/19/2016 In the matter of Annie Marie Willis was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0637

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Willis, Jessie Yvonne

Not Classified By Court

Notestein, Jerry

Decedent

Willis, Annie Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robert Lee

 

Court Documents

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Willis, Jessie(Petitioner))

Petition - Other (Petition To Appoint Successor Trustee; Supporting Declaration Of Jessie Yvonne Willis) filed.

Petition - Other (Petition To Appoint Successor Trustee; Supporting Declaration Of Jessie Yvonne Willis) filed. (Filed By: Willis, Jessie(Petitioner))

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 02/19/2016 .

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 02/19/2016 .

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Willis, Jessie(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Willis, Jessie(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Willis, Jessie(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Willis, Jessie(Petitioner))

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Willis, Jessie(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Willis, Jessie(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Will of Annie Marie Willis admitted into Probate.

Will of Annie Marie Willis admitted into Probate.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Will of Annie Marie Willis admitted into Probate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Court appointed Jerry Notestein as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Will admitted to probate on 04/21/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Jessie Yvonne Willis as Executor of the estate of Annie Marie Willis on 04/21/16, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Notestein, Jerry appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Petition - Other(Petition To Appoint Successor Trustee; Supporting Declaration Of Jessie Yvonne Willis) filed by Jessie Yvonne Willis is dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Petition - Other has been Denied .

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Willis, Jessie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Willis, Jessie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 02/19/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 04/21/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - Other (Petition To Appoint Successor Trustee; Supporting Declaration Of Jessie Yvonne Willis) filed. (Filed By: Willis, Jessie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 04/21/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Willis, Jessie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE KEON JOONG