Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 16:19:20 (UTC).

In the Matter of Alice Bettencourt

Case Summary

On 04/05/2016 In the Matter of Alice Bettencourt was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2565

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bettencourt, Joe

Defendant

Alice Bettencourt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lawrence Solorio

 

Court Documents

Petition - Other (Case Initiation) (Petn for order authorizing particular transaction) filed.

Petition - Other (Case Initiation) (Petn for order authorizing particular transaction) filed. (Filed By: Bettencourt, Joe(Petitioner))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Bettencourt, Joe(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Bettencourt, Joe(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/01/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/01/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Bettencourt, Joe(Petitioner))

Citation - Probate filed.

Citation - Probate filed. (Filed By: Bettencourt, Joe(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 06/01/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 06/01/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Order Authorizing Particular Transactions

Order Authorizing Particular Transactions

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM .

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Petition - Other (Case Initiation)(Petn for order authorizing particular transaction) filed by Joe bettencourt is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Petition - Other (Case Initiation) has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Authorizing Particular Transactions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 08/10/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 08/10/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Citation - Probate filed. (Filed By: Bettencourt, Joe(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Bettencourt, Joe(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/01/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Bettencourt, Joe(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Bettencourt, Joe(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 06/01/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - Other (Case Initiation) (Petn for order authorizing particular transaction) filed. (Filed By: Bettencourt, Joe(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence Solorio