This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/10/2017 13:56:51

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 11/07/2012 a Other case was filed by In Re Thomas Milton Tinney Iii in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXX2352
  • Filing Date 11/07/2012
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Other
  • Jurisdiction Sacramento County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse
  • County Sacramento
  • State California

Party Details

  • Petitioner Tinney Iii, Thomas Milton
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Petitioner Nguyen, Thanh
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Nguyen, Thanh(...

Fees Apply
Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Nguyen, Thanh(Petitio...

Fees Apply
Petition for Change of Name filed.

Petition for Change of Name filed. (Filed By: Nguyen, Thanh(...

Fees Apply
Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed.

Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed. (Filed By: Tinn...

Fees Apply
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Nguyen,...

Fees Apply
Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Cha...

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Cha...

Fees Apply
Decree Changing Name filed.

Decree Changing Name filed.

Fees Apply
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Nguyen, Thanh(Petit...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard
  • 12/24/2012
  • Case disposed with disposition of Granted .
  • 12/24/2012
  • Petition for Change of Name has been Granted .
  • 12/24/2012
  • Decree Changing Name filed.
  • 12/24/2012
  • Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/24/2012 09:00:00 AM .
  • 12/11/2012
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Nguyen, Thanh(Petitioner))
  • 11/19/2012
  • Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Nguyen, Thanh(Petitioner))
  • 11/15/2012
  • Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 12/24/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
  • 11/15/2012
  • Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed. (Filed By: Tinney, Thomas(Petitioner))
  • 11/07/2012
  • Nguyen, Thanh Application for Waiver granted in full on 11/07/2012 .
  • 11/07/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 54 .
  • 11/07/2012
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Nguyen, Thanh(Petitioner))
  • 11/07/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Nguyen, Thanh(Petitioner); Tinney, Thomas(Petitioner))
  • 11/07/2012
  • Petition for Change of Name filed. (Filed By: Nguyen, Thanh(Petitioner); Tinney, Thomas(Petitioner))

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.