Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/13/2021 at 23:00:08 (UTC).

IMPERIAL IRRIGATION DIST VS ALL PERSONS INTERESTED. ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/14/2004 IMPERIAL IRRIGATION DIST filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against ALL PERSONS INTERESTED. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0875

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Imperial Irrigation District

Respondents

Protect Our Water and Environment Rights

Abatti, Jim

Hilfiker, Julius

All Persons Interested in teh Matter

Hilfiker, Richard K.

Davis, Debbie

Meyer Farms

Genevieve and Raymond OConnell Trust

City of Escondido

Smith, John

South Coast Air Quality Management District

Meyer Imperial Investments II

Rood, Barbara

Vilven, Patricia L.

Russell, Carl R.

Young, Betty Jo

The Metropilitan Water District of Southern California

Krutzsch, Andrew S.

Cross Defendant

Coachella Valley Water District

37 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John Penn Carter

Respondent Attorneys

Rose M Zoia

Michael B Jackson

Mitchell A Driskill

Andrew S Krutzsch

Elizabeth A McFarland

Donald R Lincoln

Alene M Taber

Barbara Baird

Adam C Kear

Other Attorneys

Patrick J Maloney

Lisabeth Rothman

J William Yeates

Barbara E Karshmer

Melissa Hathaway McKeith

Matthew J Goldman

Lowell F Sutherland

 

Court Documents

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed.

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed. (Filed By: Imperial Irrigation District(Cross - Defendant))

Reply to Opposition filed.

Reply to Opposition filed. (Filed By: South Coast Air Quality Management District(Respondent))

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Alene M Taber) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Alene M Taber) filed. (Filed By: South Coast Air Quality Management District(Respondent))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Meyer Farms(Respondent))

Opposition (By Joint Public Agencies County Of Imperial And Imperial County Air Pollution Control District To Briefs On Scope Of Validation Filed by IID SDCWA MWD And The State of CA) filed.

Opposition (By Joint Public Agencies County Of Imperial And Imperial County Air Pollution Control District To Briefs On Scope Of Validation Filed by IID SDCWA MWD And The State of CA) filed. (Filed By: Imperial Irrigation District(Cross - Defendant))

Returned Document (Substiution of Attorney)

Returned Document (Substiution of Attorney)

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: National Audubon Society and Defenders of Wildfile(Respondent))

3DCA Order Regarding Petition for Writ of Mandate Denied (C062989)

3DCA Order Regarding Petition for Writ of Mandate Denied (C062989)

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed. (Filed By: Smith, Rodney(Witness))

Stipulation Only - Other (for Order Granting Leave to Make Special Appearance and Shortening Time for Hearing on Rodey Smith's Motion to Quash) filed.

Stipulation Only - Other (for Order Granting Leave to Make Special Appearance and Shortening Time for Hearing on Rodey Smith's Motion to Quash) filed. (Filed By: Smith, Rodney(Witness))

Cuatro Del Mar's Positition Regarding Court's Proposed Judgment

Cuatro Del Mar's Positition Regarding Court's Proposed Judgment

Public Agencies' (County of Imperial and Imperial County Air Pollution Control District) Outline of Oral Responses to Objections to Judgment

Public Agencies' (County of Imperial and Imperial County Air Pollution Control District) Outline of Oral Responses to Objections to Judgment

Judgment in Judicial Council proceeding No. 4353

Judgment in Judicial Council proceeding No. 4353

Orders Following Hearing

Orders Following Hearing

Correspondence

Correspondence

Judgment (ECU01649/04CS00875)

Judgment (ECU01649/04CS00875)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment (ECU01649/04CS00875)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2013
  • DocketLegacy Case Participant Sheet (Conversion Only) has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPublic Agencies' (County of Imperial and Imperial County Air Pollution Control District) Outline of Oral Responses to Objections to Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment in Judicial Council proceeding No. 4353

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • DocketJudgment in Judicial Council proceeding No. 4353

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrders Following Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCuatro Del Mar's Positition Regarding Court's Proposed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2009
  • DocketSmith, Rodney added as a Witness effective 10/29/2009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed. (Filed By: Smith, Rodney(Witness))

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2007
  • DocketState of California added as a Respondent effective 07/14/2004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • DocketStrahm, Roy W added as a Respondent effective 07/14/2004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • DocketVilven, Patricia L added as a Respondent effective 07/14/2004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • DocketYoung, Betty Jo added as a Respondent effective 07/14/2004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • DocketTac Land added as a Respondent effective 07/14/2004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 44 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • DocketThe Metropilitan Water District of Southern California added as a Respondent effective 12/06/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: The Metropilitan Water District of Southern California(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • DocketStatement - Other (Appendix of Non-California Cases Cited in Statement of the Metropolitan Water District of Southern California and Coachella Valley Water District Regarding Putative Class Representatives' Motion to Disqualify Counsel) filed. (Filed By: The Metropilitan Water District of Southern California(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2007
  • DocketStatement - Other (of the Metropolitan Water District of Southern California and Coachella Valley Water District Regarding Putative Class Representatives' Motion to Disqualify Counsel) filed. (Filed By: The Metropilitan Water District of Southern California(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where All Persons Interested in teh Matter is a litigant

Latest cases where Protect Our Water and Environment Rights is a litigant

Latest cases where South Coast Air Quality Management District is a litigant

Latest cases where IMPERIAL IRRIGATION DISTRICT is a litigant