This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/30/2017 at 00:18:25 (UTC).

Ida Broussard vs. Lennar Renaissance Inc

Case Summary

On 03/19/2010 Ida Broussard filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Lennar Renaissance Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3403

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alfaro, Diana

Mullen, Patrick

Giang, Minh

Pontino, Antonio

Broussard, Ida

Vartanian, Nancy

Ng, Susan

Ali, Loriza

Copeland, John

Denu, Michael

Elmido, Cynthia

Defendants

Castro, Esperonza

Suy, Shaun

Valdez, Florence

Cross Defendants

Alarm Tech Security Systems

Pacific Coast Building Products Inc

Volkerts, Keith Regis

Easy Lift Door Company Inc

Sacramento Insulation & Fireplace

ACI Mechinical USA Inc

59 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Teresa A. Libertino

Other Attorneys

William A Jenkins

Justin J McKenna

Eileen T Booth

Lisa A Lenoci

Joseph A Ferrentino

Timothy M Blaine

Leigh A Stepp

Patricia A Sisemore

John Van De Poel, Jr

Michael T Kennedy, Jr

Catharine A Ching

Yvonne V Jorgensen

Timothy C McNeill

Paul A Herp

Timothy R Smyth

Lee W Clark

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/24/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/24/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/22/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/22/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/22/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/22/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/20/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/20/2012 08:30:00 AM published .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Broussard, Ida(Plaintiff); Copeland, John(Plaintiff); Denu, Michael(Plaintiff); Diwata, Mariel(Plaintiff); Diwata, Romeo(Plaintiff); Douma, Kathryn(Plaintiff); Douma, Rick(Plaintiff); Fletcher, Anthony(Plaintiff); Ortega, Kevin(Plaintiff); Pontino, Antonio(Plaintiff); Pontino, Marilyn(Plaintiff); Swanson, Erica(Plaintiff); Swanson, Scott(Plaintiff); Vartanian, Nancy(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Broussard, Ida(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Broussard, Ida(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Broussard, Ida(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Raptakis, John(Cross - Defendant))

Association of Attorney filed.

Association of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Lennar Renaissance Inc(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Adland Venture(Cross - Defendant); CDI Flooring Inc(Cross - Defendant); R&C Masonry Inc(Cross - Defendant); RCI Electric Inc(Cross - Defendant); Raptakis, John(Cross - Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 07/25/2012 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 07/25/2012 09:00:00 AM .

Order - Other (Order Granting Cross-Defendant, Sacramento A-1 Door's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement) filed.

Order - Other (Order Granting Cross-Defendant, Sacramento A-1 Door's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement) filed.

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: ACI Mechanical USA Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Mel Leimer Masonry Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Broussard, Ida(Plaintiff))

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: ACI Mechanical USA Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Judgment or Order) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Judgment or Order) filed. (Filed By: ACI Mechinical USA Inc(Defendant))

166 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Lennar Renaissance Inc(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • Cross-Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Lennar Renaissance Inc(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Lennar Renaissance Inc(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Lennar Renaissance Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
199 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation Naming plaintiffs to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • Stipulation and Order - Other (Naming plaintiffs to complaint) filed. (Filed By: Lennar Renaissance Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Alfaro, Diana(Plaintiff); Coilton, Glory(Plaintiff); Daniel, Arthur(Plaintiff); Duenas, Benjamin(Plaintiff); Duenas, Margarita(Plaintiff); Elmido, Cynthia(Plaintiff); Elmido, Dennis(Plaintiff); Eugene, Daryl(Plaintiff); Foster, Edan(Plaintiff); Foster, Mai(Plaintiff); Giang, Minh(Plaintiff); Lennar Renaissance Inc(Defendant); Mullen, Brenda(Plaintiff); Mullen, Patrick(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2010
  • Ferrentino, Joseph A added as a effective 07/23/2010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Broussard, Ida(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • Case assigned to Department 35 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 03/19/2010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Broussard, Ida(Plaintiff); Copeland, John(Plaintiff); Denu, Michael(Plaintiff); Diwata, Mariel(Plaintiff); Diwata, Romeo(Plaintiff); Douma, Kathryn(Plaintiff); Douma, Rick(Plaintiff); Fletcher, Anthony(Plaintiff); Ortega, Kevin(Plaintiff); Pontino, Antonio(Plaintiff); Pontino, Marilyn(Plaintiff); Swanson, Erica(Plaintiff); Swanson, Scott(Plaintiff); Vartanian, Nancy(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Broussard, Ida(Plaintiff); Copeland, John(Plaintiff); Denu, Michael(Plaintiff); Diwata, Mariel(Plaintiff); Diwata, Romeo(Plaintiff); Douma, Kathryn(Plaintiff); Douma, Rick(Plaintiff); Fletcher, Anthony(Plaintiff); Ortega, Kevin(Plaintiff); Pontino, Antonio(Plaintiff); Pontino, Marilyn(Plaintiff); Swanson, Erica(Plaintiff); Swanson, Scott(Plaintiff); Vartanian, Nancy(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Alfaro, Diana(Plaintiff); Ali, Loriza(Plaintiff); Azmal, Abdul(Plaintiff); Broussard, Ida(Plaintiff); Cha, Kou(Plaintiff); Coilton, Glory(Plaintiff); Copeland, John(Plaintiff); Daniel, Arthur(Plaintiff); Denu, Michael(Plaintiff); Diwata, Mariel(Plaintiff); Diwata, Romeo(Plaintiff); Douma, Kathryn(Plaintiff); Douma, Rick(Plaintiff); Duenas, Benjamin(Plaintiff); Duenas, Margarita(Plaintiff); Elmido, Cynthia(Plaintiff); Elmido, Dennis(Plaintiff); Eugene, Daryl(Plaintiff); Fletcher, Anthony(Plaintiff); Foster, Edan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less