This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/19/2017 at 12:01:10 (UTC).

Ian S Willis vs. City of Sacramento

Case Summary

On 10/01/2015 Ian S Willis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Sacramento. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5035

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Finch, Arthur

Hauschild-Willis, Addie N.

Willis, Ian S.

Willis, Laeken J.

Gosling, Kenneth J.

Defendants

California Security & Investigation Academy Inc

Capitol Rod and Rifle Club

City of Sacramento

Does 1-100

Sacramento Rifle and Pistol Council

United Revolver Club of Sacramento Inc

Guardian Ad Litem

Hauschild, Laree A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Phillip Mastagni

David P Mastagni

Defendant Attorneys

J Edward Brooks

James Sanchez

John V. Tait

Michael J. Levangie

Christopher Renzulli

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/05/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/05/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/20/2016 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/20/2016 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/17/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/17/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Notice of Errata (Notice of Errata to Complaint) filed.

Notice of Errata (Notice of Errata to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Finch, Arthur(Plaintiff); Hauschild-Willis, Addie(Plaintiff); Willis, Ian(Plaintiff); Willis, Ian(Plaintiff))

Demurrer filed.

Demurrer filed. (Filed By: California Security & Investigation Academy Inc(Defendant))

Request - Judicial Notice filed.

Request - Judicial Notice filed. (Filed By: California Security & Investigation Academy Inc(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: United Revolver Club of Sacramento Inc(Defendant))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Willis, Ian S rejected on 12/22/2015 .

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Willis, Ian S rejected on 12/22/2015 . (Filed By: Willis, Ian(Plaintiff))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Willis, Ian(Plaintiff))

Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice filed.

Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice filed. (Filed By: United Revolver Club of Sacramento Inc(Defendant))

Affidavit - Other (of Christopher Renzulli in Support of Motion) filed.

Affidavit - Other (of Christopher Renzulli in Support of Motion) filed. (Filed By: United Revolver Club of Sacramento Inc(Defendant))

Affidavit - Other (SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF JOHN V TAIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE) filed.

Affidavit - Other (SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF JOHN V TAIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE) filed. (Filed By: United Revolver Club of Sacramento Inc(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: United Revolver club of Sacramento Inc(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Motion to Compel plfs Response to Form Interrogatory 17.1) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Motion to Compel plfs Response to Form Interrogatory 17.1) filed. (Filed By: United Revolver Club of Sacramento Inc(Defendant))

Statement of Undisputed Facts (in support of Motion to Compel plfs Ian S Willis Response to Form Interrogatory 17.1) filed.

Statement of Undisputed Facts (in support of Motion to Compel plfs Ian S Willis Response to Form Interrogatory 17.1) filed. (Filed By: United Revolver Club of Sacramento Inc(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion to Compel Form Interrogatory 17.1) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion to Compel Form Interrogatory 17.1) filed. (Filed By: United Revolver Club of Sacramento Inc(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Shawn C. Moorz in Support of Motion to Compel Form Interrogatory 17.1) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Shawn C. Moorz in Support of Motion to Compel Form Interrogatory 17.1) filed. (Filed By: United Revolver Club of Sacramento Inc(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/26/2017 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/26/2017 02:00:00 PM .

112 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion to Consolidate Cases - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 30; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Association of Attorney filed. (Filed By: United Revolver Club of Sacramento Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
141 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Demurrer filed. (Filed By: California Security & Investigation Academy Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Errata (Notice of Errata to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Finch, Arthur(Plaintiff); Hauschild-Willis, Addie(Plaintiff); Willis, Ian(Plaintiff); Willis, Ian(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Notice of Complaint Pursuant to Calfornia Labor Code 3853) filed. (Filed By: Finch, Arthur(Plaintiff); Hauschild-Willis, Addie(Plaintiff); Willis, Ian(Plaintiff); Willis, Laeken(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/05/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/02/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Finch, Arthur(Plaintiff); Hauschild-Willis, Addie(Plaintiff); Willis, Ian(Plaintiff); Willis, Laeken(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Finch, Arthur(Plaintiff); Hauschild-Willis, Addie(Plaintiff); Willis, Ian(Plaintiff); Willis, Laeken(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Finch, Arthur(Plaintiff); Hauschild-Willis, Addie(Plaintiff); Willis, Ian(Plaintiff); Willis, Laeken(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less