This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 05:36:41 (UTC).

HUBERT A ACEVEDO VS CHP; DWIGHT D HELMICK;MANUEL PADILLA

Case Summary

On 08/03/2006 HUBERT A ACEVEDO filed an Other lawsuit against CHP DWIGHT D HELMICK MANUEL PADILLA. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3307

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Acevedo, Hubert A.

Defendants

Helmick, Dwight D.

Guzman, Paula

Padilla, Manny

Helmick, D. O.

Padilla, Manuel

Nivens, Michael

California Highway Patrol

Giannoni, Bob

Townsend, Gary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory W Smith

Defendant Attorneys

Brian D. Vaughan

Randolph Cregger & Chalfant LLP

Matheny, Sears, Etc.

 

Court Documents

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (Motion to compel) filed.

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (Motion to compel) filed. (Filed By: California Highway Patrol(Defendant); Giannoni, Bob(Defendant); Nivens, Michael(Defendant); Padilla, Manny(Defendant); Townsend, Gary(Defendant))

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (motion to compel) filed.

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (motion to compel) filed. (Filed By: California Highway Patrol(Defendant); Giannoni, Bob(Defendant); Nivens, Michael(Defendant); Padilla, Manny(Defendant); Townsend, Gary(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel Discovery - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/20/2007 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel Discovery - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/20/2007 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel Discovery - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/20/2007 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel Discovery - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/20/2007 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel Discovery - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/20/2007 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel Discovery - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/20/2007 02:00:00 PM .

Motion - Other filed.

Motion - Other filed. (Filed By: California Highway Patrol(Defendant))

Notice of Entry - Other (order granting Manuel Padilla's motion to compel) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (order granting Manuel Padilla's motion to compel) filed. (Filed By: California Highway Patrol(Defendant); Giannoni, Bob(Defendant); Nivens, Michael(Defendant); Padilla, Manny(Defendant); Townsend, Gary(Defendant))

Notice of Entry - Other (order granting Gary Townsend's motion to compel) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (order granting Gary Townsend's motion to compel) filed. (Filed By: California Highway Patrol(Defendant); Giannoni, Bob(Defendant); Nivens, Michael(Defendant); Padilla, Manny(Defendant); Townsend, Gary(Defendant))

Joinder in Motion filed.

Joinder in Motion filed. (Filed By: Guzman, Paula(Defendant))

Court's Copy of the Commission for Out-Of-State Subpoenas for Depositions and Document Requests

Court's Copy of the Commission for Out-Of-State Subpoenas for Depositions and Document Requests

Reply - Other (in support of motion for protective order) filed.

Reply - Other (in support of motion for protective order) filed. (Filed By: California Highway Patrol(Defendant); Giannoni, Bob(Defendant); Nivens, Michael(Defendant); Padilla, Manny(Defendant); Townsend, Gary(Defendant))

Opposition (Plaintiff's Sur-Opposition to CHP's Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions) filed.

Opposition (Plaintiff's Sur-Opposition to CHP's Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions) filed. (Filed By: Grace, Patricia(Attorney))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: California Highway Patrol(Defendant))

Order Granting Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Setting Conference

Order Granting Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Setting Conference

Notice of Lien filed.

Notice of Lien filed. (Filed By: Acevedo, Hubert(Plaintiff))

Returned Document Form - [Substitution Of Attorney]

Returned Document Form - [Substitution Of Attorney]

Dismissal entered as requested

Dismissal entered as requested

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: California Highway Patrol(Defendant); Giannoni, Bob(Defendant); Nivens, Michael(Defendant); Padilla, Manny(Defendant); Padilla, Manuel(Defendant); Townsend, Gary(Defendant))

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference; Department: 47; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2007
  • Guzman, Paula added as a Defendant effective 07/24/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2007
  • Giannoni, Bob added as a Defendant effective 07/24/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2007
  • Acevedo, Hubert A. added as a Plaintiff effective 07/24/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2007
  • Matheny, Sears added as a Attorney effective 07/24/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2007
  • Law Office Patricia Grace added as a Attorney effective 07/24/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2007
  • Vaughan, Brian D. added as a Attorney effective 07/24/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2007
  • Grace, Patricia J. added as a Attorney effective 07/24/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2007
  • Randolph, Cregger & Chalfant LLP added as a Attorney effective 07/24/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2007
  • Cregger, Thomas A. added as a Attorney effective 07/24/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2007
  • BISHOP, MICHAEL A. added as a Attorney effective 07/24/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less