This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 06/05/2022 at 11:09:01 (UTC).

HIGARES, ANDREA S. vs. OWEHI, WAEIL

Case Summary

On 04/22/2016 HIGARES, ANDREA S filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OWEHI, WAEIL. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Carol Miller Justice Center located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1487

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIGARES, ANDREA S.

Defendant

OWEHI, WAEIL

Not Yet Classified and Other

PROGRESSIVE AUTO CENTER

 

Court Documents

Hearing Outcome

Hearing Outcome

Motion to Vacate (Cancel) Judgment - Filed

Motion to Vacate (Cancel) Judgment - Filed

Hearing Outcome

Hearing Outcome

Proof of Service - COP

Proof of Service - COP

Hearing Date - Set

Hearing Date - Set

Hearing Outcome

Hearing Outcome

Certified Mail Fee

Certified Mail Fee

Request for Dismissal of Party - Without Prejudice

Request for Dismissal of Party - Without Prejudice

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Amended

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Amended

Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted Without Hearing

Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted Without Hearing

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant > $5,000 and <= $10,000

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant > $5,000 and <= $10,000

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Hearing Outcome

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: Mediation - Referred

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: Mediation - Agreement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: Dismissed Claim Without Prejudice After Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: Motion to Vacate (Cancel) Judgment - Granted After Hearing; For: OWEHI, WAEIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion to Vacate (Cancel) Judgment - Filed; For: OWEHI, WAEIL; Hearing: 8/8/2016 8:15:00 AM; Type: Motion Vacate; Fee details; Fees Paid: $20.00; Deferred: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Recoverable: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Hearing Outcome

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketDescription: Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service - COP; For: OWEHI, WAEIL; Service Level: Valid; Recoverable: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Hearing Outcome

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketDescription: Dropped from Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Hearing Date - Set; Hearing: 7/5/2016 1:30:00 PM; Type: Large $ Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant > $5,000 and <= $10,000; Hearing: 5/27/2016 1:30:00 PM; Type: Large $ Case; Fee details; Fees Paid: $75.00; Deferred: $0.00; Waived: $75.00; Recoverable: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Filed; For: HIGARES, ANDREA S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted Without Hearing; For: HIGARES, ANDREA S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request for Dismissal of Party - Without Prejudice; For: PROGRESSIVE AUTO CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Certified Mail Fee; For: OWEHI, WAEIL; Fee details; Fees Paid: $15.00; Deferred: $0.00; Waived: $15.00; Recoverable: $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less