Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/05/2017 at 17:21:31 (UTC).

HI-VOLTAGE WIRE WORKS. INC.. ET AL VS. WALTER ZACHARIA. ETAL

Case Summary

On 11/15/2002 HI-VOLTAGE WIRE WORKS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WALTER ZACHARIA ETAL. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7030

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2002

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Power Providers a California Corporation

Corporate Control Inc A California Corporation

Hi-Voltage Wire Works Inc

Defendants

Elite Power Inc

Christensen, Monica

Burnevik, Daniel

Baker, Scott

Capitol Power Products

Zacharias, Veronika

Lorman, Joseph E.

Smith, Johnnie R.

Helm, Gregory C.

Erwin Electric Inc

Zacharias, Walter

Galvan, David J.

Herman, Ed

Foote, Charles J.

May, Todd

Interested Party

Green, Gary L.

Not Classified By Court

McIntosh, Craig

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Derian Eidson

Defendant Attorneys

Donald M Wanland, Jr

Mark H Lipton

Robert A Heintz

Coren David Wong

 

Court Documents

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 11/13/2007 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 11/13/2007 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 11/15/2007 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 11/15/2007 09:00:00 AM .

Juror Note Received

Juror Note Received

Request for Entry of Default/Court Judgment - NOT ENTERED - Court records indicate answer to 4th amended complaint was filed by Erwin Electric, Inc. on February 23, 2005

Request for Entry of Default/Court Judgment - NOT ENTERED - Court records indicate answer to 4th amended complaint was filed by Erwin Electric, Inc. on February 23, 2005

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 11/27/2007 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 11/27/2007 09:00:00 AM .

Special Verdict

Special Verdict

Minute Order RE Request for Entry of Default - Erwin Electric, Inc.

Minute Order RE Request for Entry of Default - Erwin Electric, Inc.

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike of Tax Costs - Post Trial Motions heard on 03/07/2008 01:30:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike of Tax Costs - Post Trial Motions heard on 03/07/2008 01:30:00 PM .

Paper Exhibits filed.

Paper Exhibits filed. (Filed By: Hi-Voltage Wire Works Inc(Plaintiff))

Reply - Other (Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Atty Fees) filed.

Reply - Other (Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Atty Fees) filed. (Filed By: Zacharias, Walter(Defendant))

Notice of Default

Notice of Default

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed. (Filed By: Hi-Voltage Wire Works Inc(Plaintiff))

Exhibit List filed.

Exhibit List filed. (Filed By: Zinnel, Steve(Interested Party))

Notice - Other (Ameded Notice of Motion to Quash Walter Zacharias' Application for Order for Appearance and Examination to Enforce a Judgment Requesting that Steve K Zinnel Appear) filed.

Notice - Other (Ameded Notice of Motion to Quash Walter Zacharias' Application for Order for Appearance and Examination to Enforce a Judgment Requesting that Steve K Zinnel Appear) filed. (Filed By: Zinnel, Steve(Interested Party))

Objection (to delcaration of Donald M Wanland Jr and all exhibits attached in support of reply to opposition to motion to quash Walter Zacharias' application for order for appearance and examination to enforce judgment) filed.

Objection (to delcaration of Donald M Wanland Jr and all exhibits attached in support of reply to opposition to motion to quash Walter Zacharias' application for order for appearance and examination to enforce judgment) filed. (Filed By: Zinnel, Steve(Interested Party))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Zinnel, Steve(Interested Party))

Declaration - Other (of Steven K Zinnel) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Steven K Zinnel) filed. (Filed By: Zinnel, Steve(Interested Party))

3DCA order dismissing appeal

3DCA order dismissing appeal

265 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Order of Examination - OX Calendar; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Order of Examination - OX Calendar; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Ex Parte Appearance/Hearing - Ex Parte Calendar; Department: 36; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Ex Parte Appearance/Hearing - Ex Parte Calendar; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Order of Examination - OX Calendar; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Order of Examination - OX Calendar; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order of Examination - OX Calendar; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order of Examination - OX Calendar; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order of Examination - OX Calendar; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
525 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2007
  • Lorman, Joseph E added as a Defendant effective 11/15/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2007
  • Foote, Charles J added as a Defendant effective 11/15/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2007
  • Helm, Gregory C added as a Defendant effective 11/15/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2007
  • Erwin Electric Inc added as a Defendant effective 11/15/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2007
  • Capitol Power Products added as a Defendant effective 11/15/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2007
  • Elite Power Inc added as a Defendant effective 11/15/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2007
  • Herman, Ed added as a Defendant effective 11/15/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2007
  • Power Providers a California Corporation added as a Plaintiff effective 11/15/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2007
  • Hi-Voltage Wire Works Inc added as a Plaintiff effective 11/15/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2007
  • Corporate Control Inc A California Corporation added as a Plaintiff effective 11/15/2002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Erwin Electric Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Derian D Eidson