This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/09/2017 at 14:02:43 (UTC).

Henry W Smith vs. Money Mart Express Inc

Case Summary

On 08/20/2012 Henry W Smith filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Money Mart Express Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0293

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMITH, HENRY W

Smith, Henry W.

Defendant

MONEY MART EXPRESS INC

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Smith, Henry(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Smith, Henry(Plaintiff))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Smith, Henry(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Smith, Henry(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/14/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/14/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/14/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/14/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/14/2013 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/14/2013 08:30:00 AM .

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Smith, Henry(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • TSP Referral - Clock Start Calendar scheduled for 05/30/2013 at 09:00:00 PM in Department CV_UNIT at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Smith, Henry(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/14/2013 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/14/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/14/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Smith, Henry W Application for Waiver granted in full on 09/28/2012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Smith, Henry(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/28/2012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Smith, Henry(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Smith, Henry(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Smith, Henry(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less