This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/30/2017 at 19:42:45 (UTC).

HAZEL ADAMS VS HORIZON WEST. INC. ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2006 HAZEL ADAMS filed an Other lawsuit against HORIZON WEST INC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2465

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Grass Valley Care Center Inc

Walnut Whitney Care Center Inc

Sierra Hills Care Center Inc

Horizon West Healthcare of California Inc

Valley View Skilled Nursing Center Inc

Heritage Care Center Inc

Napa Nursing Center Inc

Monterey Pines Skilled Nursing Facility Inc

Colonial Healthcare Inc

Linwood Gardens Care Center Inc

Westgate Gardens Care Center Inc

Foothill Oaks Care Center Inc

Sierra Health Care Center Inc

McKinley Health Care Center Inc

Lakeport Skilled Nursing Center Inc

Placerville Pines Care Center Inc

Lincoln Manor Inc

Live Oak Manor Inc

Arlington Gardens Care Center Inc

Interested Party

Enright, Claire

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Mark Reagan

Other Attorneys

David M Medby

 

Court Documents

Minutes finalized for Motion for Reconsideration - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/13/2007 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion for Reconsideration - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/13/2007 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel Discovery - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/19/2007 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel Discovery - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/19/2007 02:00:00 PM .

Notice of Entry - Other (of Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (of Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application) filed. (Filed By: Horizon West Healthcare of California Inc(Defendant))

Association of Attorney filed.

Association of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Horizon West Healthcare Inc(Defendant))

Correspondence (Letter-Confirming Preliminary Approval Hearing) filed.

Correspondence (Letter-Confirming Preliminary Approval Hearing) filed. (Filed By: Horizon West Healthcare of California Inc(Defendant))

Stipulation Re: Substitution of Class Representative and Order

Stipulation Re: Substitution of Class Representative and Order

Stipulation of Settlement

Stipulation of Settlement

Order of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

Order of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement

Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 01/25/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 01/25/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Motion - Other (For Final Approval of Settlement...) filed.

Motion - Other (For Final Approval of Settlement...) filed. (Filed By: Adams, Hazel(Plaintiff))

Motion for Attorney Fees filed.

Motion for Attorney Fees filed. (Filed By: Adams, Hazel(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Stephen M. Garcia in Support of Class Counsels' Motion For an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Stephen M. Garcia in Support of Class Counsels' Motion For an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses) filed. (Filed By: Adams, Hazel(Plaintiff))

Judgment, Final Order and Decree Granted.

Judgment, Final Order and Decree Granted.

Order Granting Attorneys Fee and Costs Granted.

Order Granting Attorneys Fee and Costs Granted.

Correspondence filed.

Correspondence filed. (Filed By: Adams, Hazel(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Adams, Hazel(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Stephen M Garcia) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Stephen M Garcia) filed. (Filed By: Adams, Hazel(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Of David M. Medby) filed.

Declaration - Other (Of David M. Medby) filed. (Filed By: Medby, David(Attorney))

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Civil Special Sets; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Civil Special Sets; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Civil Special Sets; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Reconsideration - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2007
  • Heritage Care Center Inc added as a Defendant effective 06/14/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2007
  • Grass Valley Care Center Inc added as a Defendant effective 06/14/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2007
  • Foothill Oaks Care Center Inc added as a Defendant effective 06/14/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2007
  • El Dorado Care Center Inc added as a Defendant effective 06/14/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2007
  • Colonial Healthcare Inc added as a Defendant effective 06/14/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2007
  • Bishop Care Center Inc added as a Defendant effective 06/14/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2007
  • Arlington Gardens Care Center Inc added as a Defendant effective 06/14/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2007
  • Adams, Hazel added as a Plaintiff effective 06/14/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2007
  • Reagan, Mark added as a effective 06/14/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2007
  • Medby, David M added as a effective 06/14/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less