This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/03/2017 at 02:31:07 (UTC).

Hall vs. Towne Development of Sacramento Inc

Case Summary

On 12/17/2010 Hall filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Towne Development of Sacramento Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3750

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nestor, Yuriy

Duran, Debbie

Mandrano, Elena

Saldana, Brenna

Badhan, Sushma

Derkach, Ivan

Kaur, Kamaldeep

Singh, Harmit

Duran, Robert

Ely, Jesse

Robinson, Michael

Defendant

Tri Construction of California Inc

Cross Defendants

Sommerkal Construction Inc

Old Country Roofing

Babij Contracting Company Inc

Wags Innovation Inc

Carter Painting

The Door & Window Co

Moes 1 - 50

Intervenor

Assurance Company of America (Zurich)

62 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gerald B Malanga

Cross Defendant Attorneys

James W Doran

Laura Buttrell

Intervenor Attorney

Justin J McKenna

Other Attorneys

Gregory G Dahl

Lindy H Scoffield

Thomas Yen

Todd A Jones

Jeffrey M Starsky

Patricia A Sisemore

Ross R Nott

Susan F Leonard

Amanda J McKechnie

Lynette Hoang

Gregory H Brown

Vik Nagpal

Thomas G Minder

David A Frenznick

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 04/25/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 04/25/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 04/25/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 04/25/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 04/25/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 04/25/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 04/25/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 04/25/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Leave to Intervene - PJ Law and Motion set on 05/02/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Leave to Intervene - PJ Law and Motion set on 05/02/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Badhan, Karnail(Plaintiff); Badhan, Sushma(Plaintiff); Barr, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Davis, Rodney(Plaintiff); Davis, Ruth(Plaintiff); Edmonson, Susan(Plaintiff); Edmonson, William(Plaintiff); Ely, Jesse(Plaintiff); Ely, Kristin(Plaintiff); Gill, Harwinder(Plaintiff); Hall, Johnnie(Plaintiff); Lindsay, Edwin(Plaintiff); McConnell, Maureen(Plaintiff); Montoya, Christopher(Plaintiff); Montoya, Debra(Plaintiff); Saldana, Alex(Plaintiff); Saldana, Brenna(Plaintiff); Zeltvay, Kim(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Badhan, Karnail(Plaintiff); Badhan, Sushma(Plaintiff); Barr, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Davis, Rodney(Plaintiff); Davis, Ruth(Plaintiff); Edmonson, Susan(Plaintiff); Edmonson, William(Plaintiff); Ely, Jesse(Plaintiff); Ely, Kristin(Plaintiff); Gill, Harwinder(Plaintiff); Hall, Johnnie(Plaintiff); Lindsay, Edwin(Plaintiff); McConnell, Maureen(Plaintiff); Montoya, Christopher(Plaintiff); Montoya, Debra(Plaintiff); Saldana, Alex(Plaintiff); Saldana, Brenna(Plaintiff); Zeltvay, Kim(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Badhan, Karnail(Plaintiff); Badhan, Sushma(Plaintiff); Barr, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Davis, Rodney(Plaintiff); Davis, Ruth(Plaintiff); Edmonson, Susan(Plaintiff); Edmonson, William(Plaintiff); Ely, Jesse(Plaintiff); Ely, Kristin(Plaintiff); Gill, Harwinder(Plaintiff); Hall, Johnnie(Plaintiff); Lindsay, Edwin(Plaintiff); McConnell, Maureen(Plaintiff); Montoya, Christopher(Plaintiff); Montoya, Debra(Plaintiff); Saldana, Alex(Plaintiff); Saldana, Brenna(Plaintiff); Zeltvay, Kim(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint (First) filed.

Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Badhan, Karnail(Plaintiff); Badhan, Sushma(Plaintiff); Barr, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Bertrand, Concepcion(Plaintiff); Bertrand, Larry(Plaintiff); Davis, Rodney(Plaintiff); Davis, Ruth(Plaintiff); Derkach, Ivan(Plaintiff); Derkach, Nadia(Plaintiff); Edmonson, Susan(Plaintiff); Edmonson, William(Plaintiff); Ely, Jesse(Plaintiff); Ely, Kristin(Plaintiff); Gill, Harwinder(Plaintiff); Hall, Johnnie(Plaintiff); Lindsay, Edwin(Plaintiff); McConnell, Maureen(Plaintiff); Montoya, Christopher(Plaintiff); Montoya, Debra(Plaintiff); Robinson, Michael(Plaintiff))

Summons (Amended) filed.

Summons (Amended) filed. (Filed By: Badhan, Karnail(Plaintiff); Badhan, Sushma(Plaintiff); Barr, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Davis, Rodney(Plaintiff); Davis, Ruth(Plaintiff); Derkach, Ivan(Plaintiff); Derkach, Nadia(Plaintiff); Edmonson, Susan(Plaintiff); Edmonson, William(Plaintiff); Ely, Jesse(Plaintiff); Ely, Kristin(Plaintiff); Gill, Harwinder(Plaintiff); Hall, Johnnie(Plaintiff); Lindsay, Edwin(Plaintiff); McConnell, Maureen(Plaintiff); Montoya, Christopher(Plaintiff); Montoya, Debra(Plaintiff); Saldana, Alex(Plaintiff); Saldana, Brenna(Plaintiff); Ward, Larry(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Hall, Johnnie(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/21/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/21/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Request - Entry of Default filed.

Request - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Badhan, Karnail(Plaintiff); Badhan, Sushma(Plaintiff); Barr, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Davis, Rodney(Plaintiff); Davis, Ruth(Plaintiff); Derkach, Ivan(Plaintiff); Derkach, Nadia(Plaintiff); Edmonson, Susan(Plaintiff); Edmonson, William(Plaintiff); Ely, Jesse(Plaintiff); Ely, Kristin(Plaintiff); Gill, Harwinder(Plaintiff); Hall, Johnnie(Plaintiff); Lindsay, Edwin(Plaintiff); McConnell, Maureen(Plaintiff); Montoya, Christopher(Plaintiff); Montoya, Debra(Plaintiff); Saldana, Alex(Plaintiff); Saldana, Brenna(Plaintiff); Ward, Larry(Plaintiff))

Default denied as to Towne Development of Sacramento Inc on Amended Complaint .

Default denied as to Towne Development of Sacramento Inc on Amended Complaint . (Filed By: Badhan, Karnail(Plaintiff); Badhan, Sushma(Plaintiff); Barr, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Bertrand, Concepcion(Plaintiff); Bertrand, Larry(Plaintiff); Davis, Rodney(Plaintiff); Davis, Ruth(Plaintiff); Derkach, Ivan(Plaintiff); Derkach, Nadia(Plaintiff); Edmonson, Susan(Plaintiff); Edmonson, William(Plaintiff); Ely, Jesse(Plaintiff); Ely, Kristin(Plaintiff); Gill, Harwinder(Plaintiff); Hall, Johnnie(Plaintiff); Lindsay, Edwin(Plaintiff); McConnell, Maureen(Plaintiff); Montoya, Christopher(Plaintiff); Montoya, Debra(Plaintiff); Robinson, Michael(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Lindsay, Edwin(Plaintiff))

309 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 11:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Complex; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to File Amended Complaint - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:19 PM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 35; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
435 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Towne Development of Sacramento Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/21/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Hall, Johnnie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons (Amended) filed. (Filed By: Badhan, Karnail(Plaintiff); Badhan, Sushma(Plaintiff); Barr, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Davis, Rodney(Plaintiff); Davis, Ruth(Plaintiff); Derkach, Ivan(Plaintiff); Derkach, Nadia(Plaintiff); Edmonson, Susan(Plaintiff); Edmonson, William(Plaintiff); Ely, Jesse(Plaintiff); Ely, Kristin(Plaintiff); Gill, Harwinder(Plaintiff); Hall, Johnnie(Plaintiff); Lindsay, Edwin(Plaintiff); McConnell, Maureen(Plaintiff); Montoya, Christopher(Plaintiff); Montoya, Debra(Plaintiff); Saldana, Alex(Plaintiff); Saldana, Brenna(Plaintiff); Ward, Larry(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Badhan, Karnail(Plaintiff); Badhan, Sushma(Plaintiff); Barr, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Bertrand, Concepcion(Plaintiff); Bertrand, Larry(Plaintiff); Davis, Rodney(Plaintiff); Davis, Ruth(Plaintiff); Derkach, Ivan(Plaintiff); Derkach, Nadia(Plaintiff); Edmonson, Susan(Plaintiff); Edmonson, William(Plaintiff); Ely, Jesse(Plaintiff); Ely, Kristin(Plaintiff); Gill, Harwinder(Plaintiff); Hall, Johnnie(Plaintiff); Lindsay, Edwin(Plaintiff); McConnell, Maureen(Plaintiff); Montoya, Christopher(Plaintiff); Montoya, Debra(Plaintiff); Robinson, Michael(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • Case assigned to Department 35 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/17/2010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Badhan, Karnail(Plaintiff); Badhan, Sushma(Plaintiff); Barr, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Davis, Rodney(Plaintiff); Davis, Ruth(Plaintiff); Edmonson, Susan(Plaintiff); Edmonson, William(Plaintiff); Ely, Jesse(Plaintiff); Ely, Kristin(Plaintiff); Gill, Harwinder(Plaintiff); Hall, Johnnie(Plaintiff); Lindsay, Edwin(Plaintiff); McConnell, Maureen(Plaintiff); Montoya, Christopher(Plaintiff); Montoya, Debra(Plaintiff); Saldana, Alex(Plaintiff); Saldana, Brenna(Plaintiff); Zeltvay, Kim(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Badhan, Karnail(Plaintiff); Badhan, Sushma(Plaintiff); Barr, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Davis, Rodney(Plaintiff); Davis, Ruth(Plaintiff); Edmonson, Susan(Plaintiff); Edmonson, William(Plaintiff); Ely, Jesse(Plaintiff); Ely, Kristin(Plaintiff); Gill, Harwinder(Plaintiff); Hall, Johnnie(Plaintiff); Lindsay, Edwin(Plaintiff); McConnell, Maureen(Plaintiff); Montoya, Christopher(Plaintiff); Montoya, Debra(Plaintiff); Saldana, Alex(Plaintiff); Saldana, Brenna(Plaintiff); Zeltvay, Kim(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Badhan, Karnail(Plaintiff); Badhan, Sushma(Plaintiff); Barr, Bonnie(Plaintiff); Davis, Rodney(Plaintiff); Davis, Ruth(Plaintiff); Edmonson, Susan(Plaintiff); Edmonson, William(Plaintiff); Ely, Jesse(Plaintiff); Ely, Kristin(Plaintiff); Gill, Harwinder(Plaintiff); Hall, Johnnie(Plaintiff); Lindsay, Edwin(Plaintiff); McConnell, Maureen(Plaintiff); Montoya, Christopher(Plaintiff); Montoya, Debra(Plaintiff); Saldana, Alex(Plaintiff); Saldana, Brenna(Plaintiff); Zeltvay, Kim(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wags Innovation Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Sommerkal Construction Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Doors & Windows is a litigant

Latest cases where Old Country Roofing is a litigant