Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/03/2017 at 13:12:20 (UTC).

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC vs. Designer Patterns For Concrete Inc

Case Summary

On 01/10/2011 Ford Motor Credit Company LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Designer Patterns For Concrete Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5468

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

Defendants

Does 1-10

Designer Patterns For Concrete Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Scott Kennard

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.

Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

Judgment - by Court - Default filed.

Judgment - by Court - Default filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal of Does filed.

Request for Dismissal of Does filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

Abstract of Judgment Issued

Abstract of Judgment Issued (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • Judgment entered .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment - by Court - Default filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • Court Judgment 04/05/11 Forwarded To Law and Motion Dept 53 for Judicial Officer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • Default entered as to Designer Patterns For Concrete Inc on Complaint .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • Case assigned to Department 44 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 01/21/2011 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Designer Patterns for Concrete Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard