This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/21/2017 at 05:42:33 (UTC).

Farmers Insurance Exchange vs. The California State University

Case Summary

On 01/21/2016 Farmers Insurance Exchange filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against The California State University. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9352

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Farmers Insurance Exchange

Defendants

Does I - X

The Board of Trustees of California State University

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David S Brahinsky

Defendant Attorney

James C Phillips

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: The Board of Trustees of California State University(Defendant))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Farmers Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: The Board of Trustees of California State University(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Farmers Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Farmers Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Farmers Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Farmers Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: The Board of Trustees of California State University(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Farmers Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed. (Filed By: The Board of Trustees of California State University(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketThe Board of Trustees of California State University added as a Defendant effective 01/21/2016 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Farmers Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Farmers Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Farmers Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Farmers Insurance Exchange(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less