Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/11/2017 at 06:26:47 (UTC).

EUGENE PURCELL. ET AL. VS. KB HOMES SACRAMENTO. INC. ETAL

Case Summary

On 09/08/2004 EUGENE PURCELL filed an Other lawsuit against KB HOMES SACRAMENTO INC ETAL. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3647

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mraule, Michelle

Cortopassi, Gary

Chao, Susan

Schell, John

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Sierra West Drywall Inc

Production Framing Systems

Alliance Building Products Inc

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Sacramento A1 Door

Production Framing Systems

Riddio Const Co Inc

Home Finishes The Builders Service Company

Sierra West Drywall Inc

Window & Glass Dynamics

Nevada Republic Electric West Inc

Cache Creek Landscape Services

RCI Inc

H&M Roofing

Alliance Building Products Inc

Tidwell Enterprises Inc

CCF Inc

St Pauls Travelers Ins Co

California Mantel Inc

AAA Masonary

66 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clayton M Anderson

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Timothy C McNeill

Matthew S Constantino

E Val Meneses

John T Hill

Karen L Jacobsen

Susan F Leonard

Donald D Harmata

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Karen L Jacobsen

Donald D Harmata

Other Attorneys

John V O'Meara

William A Jenkins

Barry C Blay

Brigitte M Mayo

Jasun C Molinelli

J Scott Donald

John Van De Poel, Jr

Richard G Arneal

John E Riddle

Joshua D Johnson

Sheila A. Reid

Mary Kay Glaspy

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 11/20/2007 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial heard on 11/20/2007 08:30:00 AM .

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Purcell, Eugene(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Purcell, Eugene(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Purcell, Eugene(Plaintiff))

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed. (Filed By: Purcell, Eugene(Plaintiff))

Dismissal entered as requested.

Dismissal entered as requested.

Dismissal entered as requested.

Dismissal entered as requested.

Dismissal entered as requested.

Dismissal entered as requested.

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Atmos Corporation(Cross - Defendant))

Dismissal not entered as requested. Case previously dismissed per 11/20/08 Minute Order of Department 47.

Dismissal not entered as requested. Case previously dismissed per 11/20/08 Minute Order of Department 47.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Purcell, Eugene(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Purcell, Eugene(Plaintiff))

Returned Document (Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service)

Returned Document (Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service)

Returned Document (Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service)

Returned Document (Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service)

Notice of Entry - Other (of order RE determination of good faith settlement) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (of order RE determination of good faith settlement) filed. (Filed By: RCI Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Notice of Entry - Other (of order re: deterimation of good faith settlement) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (of order re: deterimation of good faith settlement) filed. (Filed By: St Pauls Travelers Ins Co(Cross - Defendant))

Notice of Entry - Other (of order RE determination of good faith settlement) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (of order RE determination of good faith settlement) filed. (Filed By: Contra Costa Floor(Cross - Defendant))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: JR Pierce Plumbing Company(Cross - Defendant))

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial - Civil Trial; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2007
  • Kwake, Patricia A added as a Plaintiff effective 09/25/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2007
  • Kwake, Brian A added as a Plaintiff effective 09/25/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2007
  • Kaur, Manjit added as a Plaintiff effective 09/25/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2007
  • Hunt, San Ryae added as a Plaintiff effective 09/25/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2007
  • Gaucher, Edward Sr added as a Plaintiff effective 09/25/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2007
  • Gaucher, Dorcas added as a Plaintiff effective 09/25/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2007
  • Cortopassi, Gary added as a Plaintiff effective 09/25/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2007
  • Chao, Susan added as a Plaintiff effective 09/25/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2007
  • Chao, Ching C added as a Plaintiff effective 09/25/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2007
  • Beaton, Lisa added as a Plaintiff effective 09/25/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cache Creek Landscape Services is a litigant

Latest cases where RCI, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sierra Wes Drywall, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Tidwell Enterprises Inc is a litigant