This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/12/2017 at 05:43:59 (UTC).

Erica Farley vs. Margin Corp Mission Avenue Preschool

Case Summary

On 05/06/2013 Erica Farley filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Margin Corp Mission Avenue Preschool. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4684

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARLEY, ERICA

Defendants

MARGIN CORP MISSION AVENUE PRESCHOOL

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Julie A Doumit

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Farley, Erica(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Farley, Erica(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/07/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/07/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Farley, Erica(Plaintiff))

Notice of Settlement filed.

Notice of Settlement filed. (Filed By: Farley, Erica(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Farley, Erica(Plaintiff); Margin Corp Mission Avenue Preschool(Defendant))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Farley, Erica(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Farley, Erica(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/07/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Farley, Erica(Plaintiff); Margin Corp Mission Avenue Preschool(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed. (Filed By: Farley, Erica(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Farley, Erica(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/07/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 06/05/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Farley, Erica(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Farley, Erica(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less