This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:46:16 (UTC).

Eric Williams vs. Gregory S Myers

Case Summary

On 12/09/2015 Eric Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Gregory S Myers. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7668

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Williams, Eric

Williams, Alicia

Claimant

City of Folsom

Defendants

Myers, Gregory S.

Victory Velo Inc

The City of Folsom

Victory Velo Racing Incorporated

Crossfit Anywhere Folsom LLC

Does 1-100

Cross Plaintiff

Moes 1-100

Cross Defendants

Moes 1-25

Roes 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David P Mastagni

Sara M Peters

Alan M Laskin

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas G Beatty

Michael Patrick Clark

Wilma J Gray

Joseph A Salazar

Anne K McIntyre

Stephen E Horan

Adam M Ambrozy

Christopher M Egan

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/21/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/21/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Notice - Other (Order Granting Plantiff Exparte Motion to Continue Hearing) filed.

Notice - Other (Order Granting Plantiff Exparte Motion to Continue Hearing) filed. (Filed By: Williams, Eric(Plaintiff))

Reply (to Opp to MSJ/SA) filed.

Reply (to Opp to MSJ/SA) filed. (Filed By: Crossfit Anywhere Folsom LLC(Defendant))

Objection (to Evidence in Opp to MSJ/SA) filed.

Objection (to Evidence in Opp to MSJ/SA) filed. (Filed By: Crossfit Anywhere Folsom LLC(Defendant))

Notice of Ruling (re: stipulation to vacate judgment) filed.

Notice of Ruling (re: stipulation to vacate judgment) filed. (Filed By: Victory Velo Inc(Defendant))

Judgment (Of Dismissal) filed.

Judgment (Of Dismissal) filed. (Filed By: Crossfit Anywhere Folsom LLC(Defendant))

Summons (on Cross Complaint of Victory Velo Inc) filed.

Summons (on Cross Complaint of Victory Velo Inc) filed. (Filed By: Moes 1-100(Cross - Complainant); Victory Velo Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Answer (Amended) filed.

Answer (Amended) filed. (Filed By: Victory Velo Racing Incorporated(Defendant))

Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Demurrer) filed.

Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: The City of Folsom(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In support of Opposition to Demurrer) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In support of Opposition to Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Williams, Alicia(Plaintiff); Williams, Eric(Plaintiff))

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed. (Filed By: Victory Velo Inc(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Opposition to the City of Folsom's Demurrer) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Opposition to the City of Folsom's Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Williams, Alicia(Plaintiff); Williams, Eric(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Grant A Winter plfs' Memo in support of Opposition) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Grant A Winter plfs' Memo in support of Opposition) filed. (Filed By: Williams, Alicia(Plaintiff); Williams, Eric(Plaintiff))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Crossfit Anywhere Folsom LLC(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Williams, Alicia(Plaintiff); Williams, Eric(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Crossfit Anywhere Folsom LLC(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Myers, Gregory(Defendant))

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (Demurrer to plaintiffs second amended complaint for damages) filed.

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (Demurrer to plaintiffs second amended complaint for damages) filed. (Filed By: The City of Folsom(Defendant))

157 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:25 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
194 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Williams, Eric(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Williams, Eric(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Williams, Eric(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Victory Velo Inc(Defendant); Victory Velo Racing Incorporated(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/21/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/10/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Williams, Alicia(Plaintiff); Williams, Eric(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Williams, Alicia(Plaintiff); Williams, Eric(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Williams, Alicia(Plaintiff); Williams, Eric(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less