This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/18/2017 at 17:35:45 (UTC).

Eleanor Mark vs. Rite Aid Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/05/2015 Eleanor Mark filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Rite Aid Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2643

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark, Eleanor

Defendants

Does 1 through 10

Petrovich Development Company LLC

Rite Aid Corporation

Elk Grove and Waterman LLC

Thrifty Payless Inc

Traynor, John S.

Traynor, Ethel Joyce

Estate of John S Traynor

Cross Defendants

RMP Concrete Construction Inc

Roes 1-20

DeSilva Gates Construction LP

Northview Construction, Inc. a dissolved Idaho corporation

Roes 1-10

The De Silva Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hank G Greenblatt

Defendant Attorneys

Christian J. Smith

John P Cotter

Gregory P Arakawa

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/25/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/25/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Mark, Eleanor(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Thrifty Payless Inc(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Elk Grove and Waterman LLC(Defendant); Petrovich Development Company LLC(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Estate of John S Traynor(Defendant); Traynor, Ethel(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Estate of John S Traynor(Cross - Complainant); Traynor, Ethel(Cross - Complainant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Thrifty Payless Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Thrifty Payless Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/25/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/25/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Thrifty Payless Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Petrovich Development Company LLC(Cross - Complainant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Thrifty Payless Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Thrifty Payless Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Summons (To First Amended Cross-Complaint of Petrovich) filed.

Summons (To First Amended Cross-Complaint of Petrovich) filed. (Filed By: Elk Grove and Waterman LLC(Cross - Complainant); Petrovich Development Company LLC(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Elk Grove and Waterman LLC(Cross - Complainant); Petrovich Development Company LLC(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Mark, Eleanor(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Mark, Eleanor(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Mark, Eleanor(Plaintiff))

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 30; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Mark, Eleanor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Mark, Eleanor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Mark, Eleanor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Mark, Eleanor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Mark, Eleanor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Elk Grove and Waterman LLC(Cross - Complainant); Petrovich Development Company LLC(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons (To First Amended Cross-Complaint of Petrovich) filed. (Filed By: Elk Grove and Waterman LLC(Cross - Complainant); Petrovich Development Company LLC(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Cross-Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Elk Grove and Waterman LLC(Cross - Complainant); Petrovich Development Company LLC(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DeSilva Gates Construction LP added as a Cross - Defendant effective 03/01/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2015
  • Elk Grove and Waterman LLC added as a Defendant effective 10/28/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Thrifty Payless Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Mark, Eleanor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Mark, Eleanor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/25/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/05/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Mark, Eleanor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Mark, Eleanor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Mark, Eleanor(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less