This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/19/2017 at 14:50:01 (UTC).

Durahjae Keola-Pines vs. Comcast Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/26/2015 Durahjae Keola-Pines filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Comcast Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5978

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Butler, Kemanee

Butler, Nisonee

Keola-Pines, Durahjae

Keola-Pines, Duray

Defendants

AT&T Cable Services

Comcast Corporation

Does 1-50

Palmer, Kenneth R.

Comcast of Sacramento I LLC

Guardian Ad Litems

Butler, Michael

Griffin, Kerrie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John E Virga

Defendant Attorneys

David A. Clinton

Paul A Bigley

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/02/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/02/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Butler, Kemanee(Plaintiff); Butler, Nisonee(Plaintiff); Keola-Pines, Durahjae(Plaintiff); Keola-Pines, Duray(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/02/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/02/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Butler, Kemanee(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Megan Virga In Support Of Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Megan Virga In Support Of Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem) filed. (Filed By: Butler, Kemanee(Plaintiff))

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Butler, Nisonee(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Michael Butler In Support Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Michael Butler In Support Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem) filed. (Filed By: Butler, Nisonee(Plaintiff))

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Keola-Pines, Durahjae rejected on 10/28/2015 .

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Keola-Pines, Durahjae rejected on 10/28/2015 . (Filed By: Keola-Pines, Durahjae(Plaintiff))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Butler, Michael(Guardian Ad Litem CR))

Declaration - Other (of Kerrie Griffin in Support of Appointment of GAL) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Kerrie Griffin in Support of Appointment of GAL) filed. (Filed By: Keola-Pines, Durahjae(Plaintiff); Keola-Pines, Duray(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Kerrie Griffin GAL for Durahjae Keola-Pines) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Kerrie Griffin GAL for Durahjae Keola-Pines) filed. (Filed By: Keola-Pines, Durahjae(Plaintiff); Keola-Pines, Duray(Plaintiff))

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Keola-Pines, Durahjae(Plaintiff); Keola-Pines, Duray(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Megan Virga in Support of Appointment of GAL) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Megan Virga in Support of Appointment of GAL) filed. (Filed By: Keola-Pines, Durahjae(Plaintiff); Keola-Pines, Duray(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Kerrie Griffin in Support of Appointment of GAL) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Kerrie Griffin in Support of Appointment of GAL) filed. (Filed By: Keola-Pines, Durahjae(Plaintiff); Keola-Pines, Duray(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Kerrie Griffin GAL for Duray Keola-Pines) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Kerrie Griffin GAL for Duray Keola-Pines) filed. (Filed By: Keola-Pines, Durahjae(Plaintiff); Keola-Pines, Duray(Plaintiff))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Griffin, Kerrie(Guardian Ad Litem CR))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 06/02/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 06/02/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Comcast of Sacramento I LLC(Defendant))

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Comcast of Sacramento I LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Comcast of Sacramento I LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Palmer, Kenneth(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Clinton, David A. added as a effective 07/26/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 06/02/2016 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/02/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Keola-Pines, Durahjae(Plaintiff); Keola-Pines, Duray(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Michael Butler In Support Of Appointment Of Guardian Ad Litem) filed. (Filed By: Butler, Nisonee(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Butler, Nisonee(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Michael Butler Guardian Ad Lietem For Kemanee Butler, A Minor Successor In Interest Pursuant To CCP 377.32) filed. (Filed By: Butler, Kemanee(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Megan Virga In Support Of Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem) filed. (Filed By: Butler, Kemanee(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Michael Butler In Support Of Appointment of Guardain Ad Litem) filed. (Filed By: Butler, Kemanee(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Butler, Kemanee(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/02/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Butler, Kemanee(Plaintiff); Butler, Nisonee(Plaintiff); Keola-Pines, Durahjae(Plaintiff); Keola-Pines, Duray(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Butler, Kemanee(Plaintiff); Butler, Nisonee(Plaintiff); Keola-Pines, Durahjae(Plaintiff); Keola-Pines, Duray(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less