This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/30/2017 at 19:00:12 (UTC).

DUNMORE HOMES. ET AL VS. BENJAMIN KING CONSTRUCTION. ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/12/2006 DUNMORE HOMES filed an Other lawsuit against BENJAMIN KING CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2416

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheldon North Investors

Defendants

Rounds & Buroker

Swank Carpets

Delta Cabinets & Millwork

Beutler Corporation

American Woodmark Corporation

Ising Construction Company

Pacific Window Corporation

MT Lighting

Sherman Loehr Tile Works Inc

Cedar Valley Concrete Corporation

Mel Leimer Masonry Inc

Wallboard & Paint

Sunrise Grading Inc

Three D Electric

Lozano Tile Inc

Holmes Hally Industries

Home Centers Inc

Beutler Heating & Air Conditioning

Paul Hoover Electric

52 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sheila E Schaefer

Defendant Attorneys

J Scott Donald

Susan F Leonard

Jordan A Rodman

John V O'Meara

Julie McElroy

Avi Glikman

David M Levy

Reginald A Dunn

Other Attorneys

Drew M Johnson

Thomas G Beatty

Amanda R Lowe

Amanda J McKechnie

R Duane Skelton

Robin J Smith

Richard N Sieving

Shahin Shabahang

Melissa Wood Eisenberg

Ronald G Whitehead

John Van De Poel, Jr

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/29/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/29/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/22/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/22/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/10/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/10/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/04/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/04/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 06/18/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 06/18/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 10/15/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 10/15/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Western Shower Door Inc(Defendant))

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .

Order Granting Application of Good Faith Settlement and for Dismissal of Jeld-Wen, Inc. DBA Summit Window & Patio Door

Order Granting Application of Good Faith Settlement and for Dismissal of Jeld-Wen, Inc. DBA Summit Window & Patio Door

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Blackhawk Concrete Company Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Dunmore Homes(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 08/28/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Jeldwen Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Jeldwen Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Order authorizing execution of remaining settlement agreement by Dunmore's carriers on behalf of Dunmore (signed)

Order authorizing execution of remaining settlement agreement by Dunmore's carriers on behalf of Dunmore (signed)

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program heard on 06/18/2009 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program heard on 06/18/2009 08:30:00 AM .

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions - Civil Special Sets; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
272 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2007
  • Beutler Corporation added as a Defendant effective 06/12/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Berke Door & Hardware Inc added as a Defendant effective 06/12/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Benjamin King Construction added as a Defendant effective 06/12/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Blackhawk Concrete Company Inc added as a Defendant effective 06/12/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • BC Luse Company added as a Defendant effective 06/12/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • American Woodmark Corporation added as a Defendant effective 06/12/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Schaefer, Sheila E added as a effective 06/12/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Sheldon North Investors added as a Plaintiff effective 06/12/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Dunmore Homes added as a Plaintiff effective 06/12/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Dunmore Development Inc added as a Plaintiff effective 06/12/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less