This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/21/2018 at 09:25:49 (UTC).

Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP vs. Ahmad Beland

Case Summary

On 10/12/2017 Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP filed an Other lawsuit against Ahmad Beland. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0485

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP

Defendants

Does 1-10

Beland, Ahmad

Beland, Roshan

Osoki, Jahan

Nazarzai, John

Biland, Amir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rodney W Simmons

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew R Eason

Shawn J Ervin

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/12/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/12/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Beland, Roshan(Defendant); Biland, Amir(Defendant); Osoki, Jahan(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Beland, Ahmad(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/12/2018 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/12/2018 08:30:00 AM .

Stipulation and Order - Other (for Delivery of Interpleaded Funds to Pltf for an Order Discharging Pltf from Liabilit to any Party) filed.

Stipulation and Order - Other (for Delivery of Interpleaded Funds to Pltf for an Order Discharging Pltf from Liabilit to any Party) filed. (Filed By: Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Order Granting Stipulation for Delivery of Interpleaded Funds) filed.

Order - Other (Order Granting Stipulation for Delivery of Interpleaded Funds) filed.

Order - Other (Order Granting Stipulation for Delivery of Interpleaded Funds) filed.

Order - Other (Order Granting Stipulation for Delivery of Interpleaded Funds) filed.

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (for Delivery of Interpleaded Funds to plfs) filed.

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (for Delivery of Interpleaded Funds to plfs) filed. (Filed By: Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP(Plaintiff))

Answer (To Complaint In Interpleader) filed.

Answer (To Complaint In Interpleader) filed. (Filed By: Osoki, Jahan(Defendant))

Answer (To Complaint In Interpleader) filed.

Answer (To Complaint In Interpleader) filed. (Filed By: Biland, Amir(Defendant))

Answer (To Complaint In Interpleader) filed.

Answer (To Complaint In Interpleader) filed. (Filed By: Beland, Roshan(Defendant))

Answer (To Complaint In Interpleader) filed.

Answer (To Complaint In Interpleader) filed. (Filed By: Beland, Ahmad(Defendant))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP(Plaintiff))

Answer (To Complaint in Interpleader (CCP 386)) submitted by Beland, Ahmad rejected on 12/26/2017 .

Answer (To Complaint in Interpleader (CCP 386)) submitted by Beland, Ahmad rejected on 12/26/2017 . (Filed By: Beland, Ahmad(Defendant))

Complaint in Interpleader filed.

Complaint in Interpleader filed. (Filed By: Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP(Plaintiff))

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 23; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order Granting Stipulation for Delivery of Interpleaded Funds) filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Other (for Delivery of Interpleaded Funds to Pltf for an Order Discharging Pltf from Liabilit to any Party) filed. (Filed By: Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/12/2018 08:30:00 AM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketCase Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketCase Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/12/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Beland, Ahmad(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Beland, Roshan(Defendant); Biland, Amir(Defendant); Osoki, Jahan(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketSimmons, Rodney W added as a effective 11/06/2017 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/12/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 30 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/13/2017 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader filed. (Filed By: Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora LLP(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less